This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 09/23/2022 at 08:38:23 (UTC).

ANDREOPOULOS, JOHN D VS DAYSHIA STRONG, CHELSEA TIESHA

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 ANDREOPOULOS, JOHN D filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAYSHIA STRONG, CHELSEA TIESHA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREOPOULOS, JOHN D

Defendant

DAYSHIA STRONG, CHELSEA TIESHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREOPOULOS, JOHN DIMITRIOS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

08/24/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/24/2022:Complaint

Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading

08/24/2022:Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/24/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading

08/24/2022:Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY/CHELSEA TIESHA DAYSHIA STRONG

08/26/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY/CHELSEA TIESHA DAYSHIA STRONG

Return of Service on Summons Served ON CHELSEA TIESHA DAYSHIA STRONG 082622

08/30/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON CHELSEA TIESHA DAYSHIA STRONG 082622

Answer

09/02/2022:Answer

Motion For Default Judgment

09/07/2022:Motion For Default Judgment

Court Registry Transaction History

09/09/2022:Court Registry Transaction History

Notice of Hearing 092022 @145PM

09/09/2022:Notice of Hearing 092022 @145PM

Motion to Amend Complaint FILED BY PLAINTIFF

09/19/2022:Motion to Amend Complaint FILED BY PLAINTIFF

Copy Of Court Minutes

09/20/2022:Copy Of Court Minutes

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy Of Court Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Amend Complaint FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing 092022 @145PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Registry Transaction History

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON CHELSEA TIESHA DAYSHIA STRONG 082622

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY/CHELSEA TIESHA DAYSHIA STRONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttachment or Exhibit to Pleading

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttachment or Exhibit to Pleading

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CC003221CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less