This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/17/2022 at 08:31:04 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS CONOLY, ROBIN

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed an Other lawsuit against CONOLY, ROBIN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

CONOLY, ROBIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT ERIC

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

01/18/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT A

01/18/2022:Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT A

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/18/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF

01/19/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF

Return of Service on Summons Served 020122 NMA ROBIN CONOLY

02/03/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served 020122 NMA ROBIN CONOLY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 020122 NMA ROBIN CONOLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CC000185CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 1/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric