Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/06/2019 at 08:31:31 (UTC).

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY VS BREAULT, THERESA ANN

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BREAULT, THERESA ANN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BREAULT, THERESA ANN

Not Classified By Court

BREAULT, TERESA A

Not Yet Classified

CARLISLE, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEMPFLING, JONATHAN PHILIP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served KYLE BREAULT 042919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To THERESA ANN BREAULT AKA TERESA A BREAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 512019CC001341CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less