This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/23/2020 at 08:33:27 (UTC).

ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATE VS LARSON, CATHERINE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATE filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against LARSON, CATHERINE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATE

Defendants

LARSON, CATHERINE

MED PRO JANITORIAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZWIEBEL, ERIC BRET

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR CATHERINE LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR MED PRO JANITORIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder To Show Cause (REPLEVIN) 111720 10:00 AM TELEPHONIC CERT COPY MLD TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002559CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allegiant Partners Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zwiebel, Eric Bret