This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/12/2019 at 06:00:39 (UTC).

ALFARO, MARIANE Y VS GENERAL MILLS SALES INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2019 ALFARO, MARIANE Y filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GENERAL MILLS SALES INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALFARO, MARIANE Y

Defendants

LUSKIN, KAITLYN A

GENERAL MILLS SALES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWMAN, BRENT MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

GARCIA, ALBERT CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Return of Service on Subpoena Served

03/24/2020:Return of Service on Subpoena Served

Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL HOSPITAL

03/25/2020:Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL HOSPITAL

Return of Service on Subpoena Served

03/24/2020:Return of Service on Subpoena Served

Answer FILED BY ALBERT C GARCIA ESQ OBO DEFS

04/15/2019:Answer FILED BY ALBERT C GARCIA ESQ OBO DEFS

Mediation Results Report NO SETTLEMENT

12/04/2019:Mediation Results Report NO SETTLEMENT

Notice that Case is at Issue JURY TRIAL

04/28/2020:Notice that Case is at Issue JURY TRIAL

Notice (RULE 1.720) AND CERTIFICATION

08/29/2019:Notice (RULE 1.720) AND CERTIFICATION

Notice of Mediation Conference (AGREED) ON 102919 @130PM

07/23/2019:Notice of Mediation Conference (AGREED) ON 102919 @130PM

Amended Notice THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF AGREED MEDIATION CONFERENCE

11/12/2019:Amended Notice THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF AGREED MEDIATION CONFERENCE

Notice of Withdrawal OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; FILED BY PLTF

09/30/2019:Notice of Withdrawal OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; FILED BY PLTF

Return of Service on Subpoena Served

03/24/2020:Return of Service on Subpoena Served

Return of Service on Subpoena Unserved

03/24/2020:Return of Service on Subpoena Unserved

Return of Service on Subpoena Served

04/01/2020:Return of Service on Subpoena Served

Return of Service on Summons Served BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL HOSPITAL 03232020 @ 1:25 PM

04/02/2020:Return of Service on Summons Served BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL HOSPITAL 03232020 @ 1:25 PM

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel DF

09/30/2019:Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel DF

Return of Service on Subpoena Served

03/24/2020:Return of Service on Subpoena Served

Summons Issued And Returned To KAITLYN A LUSKIN ISSUED

03/14/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To KAITLYN A LUSKIN ISSUED

Summons Issued And Returned To GENERAL MILLS SALES INC ISSUED

03/14/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To GENERAL MILLS SALES INC ISSUED

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • Reply To Affirmative Defense FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Request For Production FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Answer FILED BY GENERAL MILLS SALES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To KAITLYN A LUSKIN ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To GENERAL MILLS SALES INC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Case 512019CA000839CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Complaint AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less