Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/14/2021 at 06:01:21 (UTC).

AGUILAR, BREANNA N VS GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 AGUILAR, BREANNA N filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR, BREANNA N

Defendants

GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY

LUKERT, JOHN PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROEBIG, THOMAS DONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To; JOHN PAUL LUKERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To; GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CFG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketExhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA000626CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO Secure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roebig, Thomas D, Jr.