This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 17:26:06 (UTC).

A WOZNIAK VS Z TODOROVIC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 A WOZNIAK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Z TODOROVIC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WOZNIAK, MARLA

WOZNIAK, ALAN

Defendants

GRINDY ENTERPRISES INC

LL EXPRESS LLC

TODOROVIC, ZARKO

EXPERT TRANSPORTATION AND SERV

21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURA

Not Classified By Court

LAND O LAKES RECYCLING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLMAN, JULIA NICOLE

Defendant Attorneys

HIGGINBOTTOM, SAMUEL CARLSON

HODGES, EMMETT PEYTON

FIFNER, DAVID ALAN

WHITAKER, MICHAEL WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice FILED OBO PLTFS

02/15/2018:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice FILED OBO PLTFS

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

02/14/2018:ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To TO PLFS

11/17/2017:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To TO PLFS

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To TO PLFS

11/17/2017:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To TO PLFS

Notice of Completion or Compliance FILED BY LL EXPRESS, LLC

09/14/2017:Notice of Completion or Compliance FILED BY LL EXPRESS, LLC

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY EXPERT TRANSPORTATION & SERVICE, INC.

09/07/2017:Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY EXPERT TRANSPORTATION & SERVICE, INC.

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY EXPERT TRANSPORTATION & SERVICE INC.

09/07/2017:Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY EXPERT TRANSPORTATION & SERVICE INC.

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

08/16/2017:Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Order

07/14/2017:Order

RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S ZARKO TODOROVIC LL EXPRESS LLC, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ALAN WOZNIAK AND MARIA WOZNIAK

06/30/2017:RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S ZARKO TODOROVIC LL EXPRESS LLC, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ALAN WOZNIAK AND MARIA WOZNIAK

Notice OF MEDIATION ON 082117 @1PM

06/27/2017:Notice OF MEDIATION ON 082117 @1PM

Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF CRAIG DERNIS

06/22/2017:Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF CRAIG DERNIS

Affidavit OF RICHARD MILLIAN

06/22/2017:Affidavit OF RICHARD MILLIAN

Affidavit OF ALAN WOZNIAK

06/22/2017:Affidavit OF ALAN WOZNIAK

Notice of Hearing (SECOND AMENDED) 063017@9AM

06/06/2017:Notice of Hearing (SECOND AMENDED) 063017@9AM

Response To Request To Produce FILED BY LL EXPRESS LLC

06/02/2017:Response To Request To Produce FILED BY LL EXPRESS LLC

Response To Request To Produce FILED BY ZARKO TODOROVIC

06/02/2017:Response To Request To Produce FILED BY ZARKO TODOROVIC

Privilege Log FILED BY ZARKO TODOROVIC AND LL EXPRESS LLC

06/02/2017:Privilege Log FILED BY ZARKO TODOROVIC AND LL EXPRESS LLC

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketCase Status set to RECLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice FILED OBO PLTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketStipulation of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Deposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Deposition 010818

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketAmended Notice of Taking Deposition CORP REP LL EXPRESS LLC 010318

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketAmended Notice of Taking Deposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
293 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON 21ST CENTURY CENTENIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON GRINDY ENTERPRISES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA002158CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 7/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketReopen Date: 06/02/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketReopen Date: 04/20/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketReopen Date: 03/09/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketReopen Date: 01/07/2016; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLMAN, JULIA NICOLE