This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 07/16/2019 at 13:00:49 (UTC).

A ESPINOZA VS T GARCIA

Case Summary

On 02/21/2006 A ESPINOZA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against T GARCIA. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JPMC SPECIALTY MORTGAGE LLC

ESPINOZA, ARCENIA

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

ALL OTHERS

AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

WM SPECIALTY MORTGAGE LLC

CRUMPTON PAULINE AS TRUSTEE OF

ESPINOSA, ARCENIA

GARCIA TEODORO UNKNOWN SPOUSE

LONG BEACH MORTGAGE

GARCIA, ARCENIA ESPINOZA

GARCIA, THEODORO

MARTINEZ, ARCENIA ESPINOZA

Assignee

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAYTON, WILLIAM GEORGE

Defendant Attorney

FRIEDMAN, BRIDGET MARY

Other Attorneys

SOCKOL, DAVID JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Title Issued To JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Disbursements 0.00 MLD 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketCase Progress Notes $8.00 FILING FEES DUE- TITLE PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssignment Of Judgment JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssignment Of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketCase Progress Notes 3.00 fee due at this time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketCertificate Of Sale With Attached Proof Of Publica SOLD TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK $24,100.00 MLD 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssignment Of Judgment (TRANSFERRED FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE 2009CA10645ES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof Of Publication 011116

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Sale 011116 11:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURN SRVD: ON TEDDORD GARCIA 022706; GARCIA TEODORO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTY ON UNKN SPOUSE OF TEODORO GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTY ON TEODORO GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTY ON AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • DocketPMT:CA FF GENERAL; B46844; $255.00; ESPINOZA ARCENIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • DocketFILING OPENED FOR SRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • DocketCOMPLAINT: (X) ATTACHMENT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • DocketNTC OF LIS PENDENS SENT TO RECORDING (1) PAGES ON 02/22/2006; ESPINOZA ARCENIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • DocketASM:CA FF GENERAL; $255.00; ESPINOZA ARCENIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WM SPECIALTY MORTGAGE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LONG BEACH MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMC SPECIALTY MORTGAGE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant