This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 14:29:05 (UTC).

A AND K ENERGY CONSERVATION INC VS T KNOWLES

Case Summary

On 06/16/2015 A AND K ENERGY CONSERVATION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against T KNOWLES. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A AND K ENERGY CONSERVATION IN

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

KNOWLES, THERESA

Not Classified By Court

KHAN ARNDT & ASSOCIATES PA

ARNDT, SCOTT

KNOWLES, THERESA

MARIANI, EDWARD

KNOWLES, TRIXIE

ARNDT & ASSOCIATES PA

KEYLON, RENEE

HOGARD, CONNIE

CAGLE, PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNET, MARK JAMES

Defendant Attorney

PLANTE, DAVID JOSEPH

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

HENSEL, MARJORIE SALEM

KAHLE, DOUGLAS A

 

Court Documents

Motion FOR RECONSIDERATION, FILED BY DEF

03/30/2017:Motion FOR RECONSIDERATION, FILED BY DEF

Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs FILED BY THERESA KNOWLES

03/10/2017:Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs FILED BY THERESA KNOWLES

Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs FILED BY THERESA KNOWLES

03/10/2017:Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs FILED BY THERESA KNOWLES

Amended Complaint FILED BY PLF

04/13/2016:Amended Complaint FILED BY PLF

Order Granting MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

03/15/2016:Order Granting MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

Motion For Protective Order FILED BY PLF

03/24/2017:Motion For Protective Order FILED BY PLF

Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs FILED BY THERESA KNOWLES

03/10/2017:Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs FILED BY THERESA KNOWLES

Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs FILED BY THERESA KNOWLES

03/10/2017:Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs FILED BY THERESA KNOWLES

Order Granting PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

03/28/2017:Order Granting PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Filing ATTACHED NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF STATE COURT CIVIL ACTION TO BANKRUPTCY COURT; FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion TO STAY OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO DISMISS, FILED BY SCOTT ARNDT AND ARNDT & ASSOCIATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion TO STAY OR ABATE ACTION, FILED BY EDWARD MARIANI; PATRICIA CAGLE; SCOTT ARNDT; RENEE KEYLON; CONNIE HOGARD AND KHAN ARNDT & ASSOCIATES, PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance OBO EDWARD MARIANI, PATRICIA CAGLE, SCOTT ARNDT, RENEE KEYLON, CONNIE HOGARD AND KHAN, ARNDT & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketNotice Of Cancellation OF HEARING 051017 AT 1000AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served PATRICIA CAGLE; 042417; NMA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served RENEE KEYLON; 042517; NMA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS RETD SVD 041817 KAHN, ARNDT & ASSOCIATES, PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS RETD SVD 041917 NMA EDWARD MARIANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss FILED BY THERESA KNOLWES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketMotion For Extension Of Time FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketConsent TO DEF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served THERESA KNOWLES; 072215; MILITARY STATUS NOT SPECIFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY ON THERESA KNOWLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA001847CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/16/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERNET , MARK JAMES