Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/27/2019 at 13:17:22 (UTC).

YOUNG, ANNE R V RESNICK, A ALLAN

Case Summary

On 02/27/2002 YOUNG, ANNE R filed an Other lawsuit against RESNICK, A ALLAN. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************E-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YOUNG , ANNE R

Defendants, Respondents, Petitioners, Appellants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

CONRAD , MARY S

YOUNG , ANNE R

RESNICK , MILDRED

FOGG , NITA S

WILSON , LISA C

DAYAN , SALOMON J

MONELL JR, EDWARD C

WILLINGER , HARDING W

PRUDDEN , SHIRLEY

TOLLMAN , BEATRICE

MONELL , TERRY T

GILLET , ELESABETH I

MENDEL , NANCY W

PRUDDEN JR, HORTON R

PRUDDEN , JAMES D

SCAIFFE , FRANCES G

WILSON , GREGORY L

CHOPIN , FRANK L

POWER , MARIA

POWER , RICHARD

Respondents and 3Rd Party Defendants

FOGG , NITA S

WILSON , LISA C

DAYAN , SALOMON J

MONELL JR, EDWARD C

WILLINGER , HARDING W

PRUDDEN , SHIRLEY

TOLLMAN , BEATRICE

MONELL , TERRY T

GILLET , ELESABETH I

MENDEL , NANCY W

PRUDDEN JR, HORTON R

PRUDDEN , JAMES D

SCAIFFE , FRANCES G

WILSON , GREGORY L

CHOPIN , FRANK L

POWER , MARIA

POWER , RICHARD

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SELLERS ESQ, JULIE L

FITZGERALD ESQ, ROY E

BRETON ESQ, PETER LEIGH

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WARD II ESQ, PHILIP H

HICKMAN ESQ, CHARLES RYAN

FARACH , MANUEL

WAXMAN ESQ, LYNN G

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

07/26/2010:ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

ORDER DENYING

06/09/2010:ORDER DENYING

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

06/08/2010:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/01/2010:NOTICE OF HEARING

CLERK'S NOTE

02/11/2010:CLERK'S NOTE

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/07/2009:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER

11/24/2009:ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/18/2009:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

09/16/2009:MOTION

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

06/20/2008:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE TRANSMIT RECORD APPEAL

09/28/2007:NOTICE TRANSMIT RECORD APPEAL

NOTICE TRANSMIT RECORD APPEAL

09/28/2007:NOTICE TRANSMIT RECORD APPEAL

INVOICE

07/21/2007:INVOICE

MOTION

07/05/2007:MOTION

NOTICE

07/02/2007:NOTICE

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

05/08/2007:MOTION TO WITHDRAW

MOTION

03/22/2007:MOTION

MOTION

02/26/2007:MOTION

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2012
  • DISPOSED AFTER OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:DAO T MCCARTHY -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOT FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Filed by PLAINTIFF ANNE R YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF WITHDRAWING W/O PREJ JOINDER IN THE VERIFIED MOTION OF PLTF FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING DEFT MARY CONRAD TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SHE SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN DIRECT CONTEMPT OF COURT Filed By 3RD PARTY DEFENDANT SALOMON J DAYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF WITHDRAWING W/O PREJ Filed by ATTORNEY ALFRED A LASORTE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST; Notes:Filed by APPELLANT MARY S CONRAD. Filed by DEFENDANT MARY S CONRAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WITNESS LIST; Notes:(TRIAL) Filed by DEFENDANT MARY S CONRAD. Filed by APPELLANT MARY S CONRAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:Filed by ATTORNEY MANUEL FARACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL; Notes:18-FEB-10

    Read MoreRead Less
229 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2007
  • Receipt Number:CAMB188901; Receipt Amount: $5.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2007
  • Receipt Number:CAMB170490; Receipt Amount: $11.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Receipt Number:CAMB167831; Receipt Amount: $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Receipt Number:CAMB167830; Receipt Amount: $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2007
  • Receipt Number:CAMB159916; Receipt Amount: $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$313.50; total Amount Paid:$313.50; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • Due Date:11/28/2007; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.50; Amount Paid:$5.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2007
  • Due Date:08/21/2007; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$11.50; Amount Paid:$11.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • Due Date:07/20/2007; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$245.50; Amount Paid:$245.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2007
  • Due Date:06/15/2007; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less