Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/02/2019 at 14:09:02 (UTC).

YACOVELLA, DOMINIC S SR V PAVONE, JOSEPH T

Case Summary

On 01/04/2008 YACOVELLA, DOMINIC S SR filed an Other lawsuit against PAVONE, JOSEPH T. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

YACOVELLA , CHRISTINE M

YACOVELLA SR, DOMINIC S

PAVONE ESQ., JOSEPH T.

Defendants and Respondents

PAVONE , DOREEN A

PAVONE , JOSEPH T

WALDEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

VAN KIRK & SONS INC

MADISON GREEN MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

VILLAGE OF ROYAL PALM BEACH FL

CROWN SEAMLESS GUTTERS INC

Respondents and Counter Defendants

YACOVELLA SR., DOMINIC S.

PAVONE , DOREEN A

YACOVELLA , CHRISTINE M.

PAVONE , JOSEPH T

WALDEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

VAN KIRK & SONS INC

MADISON GREEN MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

VILLAGE OF ROYAL PALM BEACH FL

CROWN SEAMLESS GUTTERS INC

Petitioner and Counter Plaintiff

PAVONE ESQ., JOSEPH T.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

COTZEN ESQ, MICHAEL L

HALE ESQ, STEPHANIE A

SAUVOLA ESQ, NICOLE

COHEN ESQ, JEREMY ADAM

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

VERICKER ESQ, WILLIAM

BERGIN JR, ROBERT THOMAS

BRADLEY , DAVID P

RICHARDS , JOHN H

CHIOCCA , JOHN A

SANTANIELLO , DANIEL J

PARKER ESQ, JAMES K

ABBOTT ESQ, LYNN GAMBINO

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

05/21/2013:ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

AFFIDAVIT

04/11/2013:AFFIDAVIT

MOTION

04/11/2013:MOTION

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/16/2013:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/19/2012:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/21/2011:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

05/18/2011:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

MOTION TO DISMISS

05/12/2011:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE

05/11/2011:NOTICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

04/12/2011:NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/31/2011:NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/03/2011:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/24/2011:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

STIPULATION

06/02/2010:STIPULATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF:

08/03/2009:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF:

NOTICE

08/22/2008:NOTICE

OBJECTION

08/21/2008:OBJECTION

ORDER

02/06/2008:ORDER

351 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2013
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 26224 PAGE 472; Notes:FINAL M SASSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 26196 PAGE 1588; Notes:D CROW DBO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION; Notes:OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED UNSIGNED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION; Notes:FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes:VANK KIRK & SONS, INC. AND CROWN SEAMLESS GUTTERS, INC F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF CHRISTINE M YACOVELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION REPORT; Notes:MEDIATION REPORT = FB MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
371 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF DOMINIC S YACOVELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF DOMINIC S YACOVELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2008
  • PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2008
  • CAFF; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF DOMINIC S YACOVELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2008
  • ADDITIONAL COMMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • Receipt Number:CAMB550697; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • Receipt Number:CAMB189804; Receipt Amount: $256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$276.00; total Amount Paid:$276.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • Due Date:04/20/2011; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • Due Date:01/07/2008; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$256.00; Amount Paid:$256.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VAN KIRK & SONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VILLAGE OF ROYAL PALM BEACH FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where MADISON GREEN MASTER ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cotzen, Michael L