This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/28/2019 at 18:48:01 (UTC).

WITKIEWICZ, ANTHONY R V ACANDS INC

Case Summary

On 11/05/1999 WITKIEWICZ, ANTHONY R filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ACANDS INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARTAU , EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************F-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARTAU , EDWARD

 

Party Details

Respondents and Defendants

GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION

A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES INC

LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY

HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY

CONGOLEUM CORPORATION

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

EASTERN REFRACTORIES

NOSROC CORP

DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

DRESSER INDUSTRIES

HARBISON-WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY

SHOOK & FLETCHER INSULATION

A.W. CHESTERTON

GARLOCK INC

UNITED STATES MINERALS

MAREMONT CORP

AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC

W.R. GRACE & COMPANY

DANA CORPORATION

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MORLAN ESQ, HAROLD E

COLE , SUSAN J

CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE

LAYNE ESQ, PAUL J

REISS , MARLENE S

HANRECK , ROBERT J

Other Attorneys

COCKREN , ROBERT W

KIBBE , REBECCA C

GALARDI ESQ, DINO

ZASLOW , ANDREW

UNGER ESQ, MARTIN B

EVERTJR ESQ, C MICHAEL

CLARK , TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE

05/31/2019:CORRESPONDENCE

RETURNED MAIL

05/23/2019:RETURNED MAIL

ORDER E ARTAU: (NOTICE) DIRECTING CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY LOSE REOPENED CAES: DTD 5-15-19

05/15/2019:ORDER E ARTAU: (NOTICE) DIRECTING CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY LOSE REOPENED CAES: DTD 5-15-19

MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES F/B PLT

11/08/2018:MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES F/B PLT

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

08/21/2018:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/21/2018:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

REPORT

08/21/2018:REPORT

REPORT

08/21/2018:REPORT

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

08/21/2018:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

08/21/2018:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

08/21/2018:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

REPORT

08/20/2018:REPORT

SUGGESTION

08/10/2018:SUGGESTION

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/24/2018:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/24/2018:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING

05/23/2018:ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING

ORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

11/07/2017:ORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

11/01/2017:STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Notes:FROM CT CORPORATION TO EDWARD ARTAU DTD 5/23/2019 (JUDGE'S NOTATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:MARTIN B UNGER ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER E ARTAU: (NOTICE) DIRECTING CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY LOSE REOPENED CAES: DTD 5-15-19; Notes:E ARTAU: (NOTICE) DIRECTING CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY LOSE REOPENED CAES: DTD 5-15-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES F/B PLT; Notes:TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:F/B PLTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL REMAINING DFTS F/B PLTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT; Notes:CASE MANAGEMENT F/B DFT CLEAVER BROOKS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT; Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT F/B DFTS HOBART BROTHERS LLC, THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY AND PFIZER INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:DEFENDANT PFIZER, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' MASTER PRELIMINARY INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:DEFENDANT THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' MASTER PRELIMINARY INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketPENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 11/05/99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING) OF PLTF AS TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketRECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00279797 FERRARO AND ASSOC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y W/ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes:COURT NOTES **CASE STAYED DE#30**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • DocketReceipt Number:CAMB203940; Receipt Amount: $59.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • DocketTotals: total Amount Due:$260.50; total Amount Paid:$51.00; total-Amount Balance:$209.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • DocketDue Date:04/28/2008; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$209.50; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$209.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • DocketDue Date:03/21/2008; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less