Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/22/2019 at 18:20:30 (UTC).

TEL CHOICE LLC V BELL SOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC

Case Summary

On 05/10/2001 TEL CHOICE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against BELL SOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents, Petitioners, Appellants and Counter Defendants

SMALL BUSINESS OWNERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA INC

TEL CHOICE LLC

Defendants, Respondents, Appellants and Counter Defendants

BELL SOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC

SMALL BUSINESS OWNERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA INC

TEL CHOICE LLC

POLAND , KENNETH

KANE , RUSSELL

GARCIA , EMILE

BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC

PARADISE , TOM

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

POLAND , KENNETH

BELL SOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC

KANE , RUSSELL

GARCIA , EMILE

BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC

PARADISE , TOM

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Plaintiff, Petitioner and Counter Defendant Attorneys

CURLEY JR ESQ, GERARD JOSEPH

SANTANIELLO , DANIEL J

AIELLO ESQ, JACK JOSEPH

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HAMILTON ESQ, WILLIAM F

JACKSON ESQ, HANK

KREUSLER-WALSH , JANE

Defendant, Respondent, Petitioner and Counter Defendant Attorneys

HAMILTON ESQ, WILLIAM F

JACKSON ESQ, HANK

KREUSLER-WALSH , JANE

CURLEY JR ESQ, GERARD JOSEPH

SANTANIELLO , DANIEL J

AIELLO ESQ, JACK JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S NOTE

05/12/2009:CLERK'S NOTE

CLERK'S NOTE

03/25/2009:CLERK'S NOTE

ORDER

01/03/2008:ORDER

MOTION TO COMPEL

06/04/2007:MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION

05/30/2007:MOTION

MOTION TO COMPEL

05/25/2007:MOTION TO COMPEL

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

05/15/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

MOTION

05/11/2007:MOTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/08/2007:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AGREED ORDER

03/23/2007:AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE

03/22/2007:NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

03/14/2007:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

ORDER

03/13/2007:ORDER

DISCLOSURE

03/05/2007:DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/20/2007:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

SUPPLEMENT

02/15/2007:SUPPLEMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/14/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/09/2007:NOTICE OF SERVICE

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:OF EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ADDRESSED TO WILLIAM F HAMILTON ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:NOTICE OF EVIDENCE DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:NOTICE OF EVIDENCE DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:NOTICE OF EVIDENCE DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD; Notes:REASSEMBELD 4D05-4160

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT CHECK IN RECEIPT; Notes:DATED 03-06-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:OF RETURN OF EXHIBITS, SUPERSEDEAS BOND, SIGNED BY KELLI A ELSON (???)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2008
  • REDISPOSED; Notes:Associated to docket MOT filed on 2003-02-06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:GRANTING AGREEM MOTION FOR RELEASE OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND. **CALLED ATTY AND ORIG BOND MAILED/RETURNED TO ATTY DTD 1/7/08**

    Read MoreRead Less
1,223 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2001
  • PENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 05/10/01 INDEX 12/9/05 CROSS APPEAL EXT 12/19/05 **SEE DE# 977 FOR BOND** **PER APPELLANT'S ATTY OFFICE (JANE WALSH) CT'S REPORTER REQUESTED & DE #1009 EXT TO 2/9/06***12/6/05 MC DONE 2/1/06 SHIP 2/17/05 EXT 2/27/05 EXT 3/20/06 SHIPPED 3/16/06 SUPP 1/20/06 DONE 2/1/06 PD 2/21/06 SHIPPED 3/16/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2001
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00308913 GUNSTER YOAKLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2001
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2001
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • Receipt Number:CAMB103564; Receipt Amount: $1,559.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • Receipt Number:CAMB93275; Receipt Amount: $57.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,617.00; total Amount Paid:$1,617.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • Due Date:01/31/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,559.50; Amount Paid:$1,559.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • Due Date:10/31/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • Due Date:10/31/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$6.50; Amount Paid:$6.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELL SOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURLEY JR ESQ, GERARD JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Santaniello, Daniel J