Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/28/2019 at 14:06:53 (UTC).

SUPPERS, JOSEPH H JR V SWITCH & DATA FL FOUR LLC

Case Summary

On 05/01/2002 SUPPERS, JOSEPH H JR filed an Other lawsuit against SWITCH DATA FL FOUR LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************B-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SUPPERS , EMILEE C

SUPPERS JR, JOSEPH H

NODE COM INC

TQ WEST PALM LLC

Defendants and Respondents

PARTNERS NATIONAL REAL ESTATE GROUP INC

MARMON , ROBERT A

SLON , SANDRA GOLDSTEIN

SWITCH & DATA FACILITIES COMPANY LLC

HIGGINS , PATRICIA L

TRAMMELL CORW REALTY SERVICES INC

POLLOCK JR, GEORGE A

RARESHIDE , MICHAEL

SWITCH & DATA HOLDINGS INC

WACHOVIA BANK NA FKA FIRST UNION NATIONAL BANK

SWITCH & DATA FACILITIES COMPANY INC

TROY & GOULD PC

ABRAMOWITZ , KENNETH I

WACHOVIA BANK NA INTEREST TO FIRST UNION NATIONAL BANK

LAVIN , JAMES F

SWITCH & DATA FL FOUR LLC

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SEIDEN ESQ, ANDREW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GOLDSTEIN ESQ, GLENN EVAN

EVANS ESQ, DAVID LEONARD

CAMERIK ESQ, HOWARD M

LEWIS ESQ, CARYN BELLUS

SCHWED ESQ, LLOYD R

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

05/14/2007:NOTICE

MEDIATION REPORT

04/19/2007:MEDIATION REPORT

MOTION TO COMPEL

04/16/2007:MOTION TO COMPEL

LETTER

04/10/2007:LETTER

NOTICE

04/09/2007:NOTICE

ORDER

03/19/2007:ORDER

ORDER

03/19/2007:ORDER

ORDER

03/19/2007:ORDER

NOTICE

03/14/2007:NOTICE

RESPONSE TO:

03/14/2007:RESPONSE TO:

ORDER

02/26/2007:ORDER

ORDER

02/21/2007:ORDER

AGREED ORDER

02/20/2007:AGREED ORDER

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/20/2007:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/20/2007:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

LETTER

02/14/2007:LETTER

LETTER

02/13/2007:LETTER

DISCLOSURE

02/05/2007:DISCLOSURE

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE Filed by PLAINTIFF NODE COM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2007
  • DISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes:Associated to docket FDS filed on 2007-05-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE Filed by DEFENDANT SWITCH & DATA FL FOUR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED; Notes:TO ARVIN JAFFE, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Filed by PLAINTIFF NODE COM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION REPORT; Notes:PARTIES WISH TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED; Notes:MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO 3RD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS Filed by PLAINTIFF NODE COM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO COMPEL; Notes:COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO COMPEL; Notes:ANSWERS TO 3RD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
795 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2005
  • Receipt Number:CAMB88910; Receipt Amount: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2005
  • Receipt Number:CAMB85604; Receipt Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • Receipt Number:CAMB5827; Receipt Amount: $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2003
  • Receipt Number:CAMB1179; Receipt Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$410.00; total Amount Paid:$410.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • Due Date:09/02/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$15.00; Amount Paid:$15.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • Due Date:07/15/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2003
  • Due Date:03/26/2003; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$220.00; Amount Paid:$220.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2003
  • Due Date:02/19/2003; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2003
  • Due Date:02/19/2003; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wachovia Bank, National Assn is a litigant