This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/28/2019 at 19:17:08 (UTC).

SMITH, JAMES H V ACANDS INC

Case Summary

On 11/08/1999 SMITH, JAMES H filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ACANDS INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SMITH , JOAN

Respondents and Defendants

CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY

LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY

HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY

PFIZER CORP

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

JOHN CRANE, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

EASTERN REFRACTORIES

NOSROC CORP

SHOOK & FLETCHER INSULATION INC

MINNESOTA MINING MANUFACTURING COMPANY DBA 3M

UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY

A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC.

DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

GARLOCK, INC.

DRESSER INDUSTRIES

HARBISON-WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY

NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES INC

UNITED STATES MINERALS

68 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GUERNSEY ESQ, DANIEL BRONSON

FLETCHER , EVELYN M

REISS , MARLENE S

MORLAN ESQ, HAROLD E

STUZIN ESQ, LAURA M

Other Attorneys

COLE , SUSAN J

BICE ESQ, JEAN A

UNGER ESQ, MARTIN B

CONZO ESQ, VALERIE A

JOHNSON , VIRGINIA EASLEY

MATTHEWS JR ESQ, FLOYD L

IOVINO ESQ, CAROLINE M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/08/2007:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER

06/08/2005:ORDER

RESPONSE TO:

06/07/2005:RESPONSE TO:

RESPONSE TO:

05/16/2005:RESPONSE TO:

ORDER/RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

04/25/2005:ORDER/RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER/RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

04/07/2005:ORDER/RULE TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER

11/05/2004:ORDER

STATEMENT

10/08/2002:STATEMENT

NOTICE OF NON FINAL APPEAL

10/04/2002:NOTICE OF NON FINAL APPEAL

NOTICE

09/13/2002:NOTICE

ORDER

09/11/2002:ORDER

NOTICE OF FILING

07/26/2002:NOTICE OF FILING

REPLY/RESPONSE

05/22/2002:REPLY/RESPONSE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/14/2002:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/14/2002:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/14/2002:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/14/2002:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/14/2002:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:(PLTS'), WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DFT, CROWN, CORK & SEAL, ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2005
  • DocketREDISPOSED; Notes:Associated to docket ORD filed on 2005-06-08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Notes:RE-CLOSING CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO:; Notes:PLTFS SUPPLEMENTAL - TO AMENDED SUA SPONTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED - ATTY DINO G GALARDI ESQ - FBN 0628220

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO:; Notes:OF FERRARO & ASSOCIATES PA TO AMENDED SUA SPONTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED - ATTY DINO G GALARDI ESQ FBN 0628220

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER/RULE TO SHOW CAUSE; Notes:AMENDED - SUA SPONTE - WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED - 05/20/05 @ 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER/RULE TO SHOW CAUSE; Notes:(COPY) SUA SPONTE - WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED - 05/13/05 @ 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Notes:(COPY)GRANTING MOTION BY COUNSEL FOR EASTERN REFRACTORIES COMPANY INC TO WITHDRAW AND REQUIRING RETENTION OF LOCAL COUNSEL; THE LAW FIRM OF STEPHENS LYNN KLEIN LACAVA HOFFMAN & PUYA PA IS RELIEVED; EASTERN REFRACTORIES SHALL RETAIN NEW COUNSEL W/I 30 DAYS; SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS (ORIGINAL ORDER FILED IN CASE NO 95-50,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT; Notes:(STATEMENT) TO MARLENE S. REISS, ESQ., FOR $61.00 FOR APPEAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON FINAL APPEAL; Notes:<>

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Notes:(MOTION) OF DEF, WR GRACE & CO, FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PUNITIVE DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:(MOTION TO DISMISS) ; COMPANY NAME IS W.R. GRACE & COMPANY ; ATTORNEY NAME IS VIRGINIA E JOHNSON AND M/TO STRIKE & ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF DEF, JOHN CRANE INC, OF ADOPTION OF STATEMENT OF NON WAIVER & ANSWER TO "FERRARO MARRIED AMENDED COMPLAINT" & OMNIBUS ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Notes:(NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ATTORNEY:) ; COMPANY NAME IS JOHN CRANE, INC. ; ATTORNEY NAME IS LAWRENCE E MARGOLIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) ; COMPANY NAME IS A W CHESTERTON OF ADOPTION OF MASTER STANDARD ANSWER/AFFIRM DEFENSES, MOTION TO DISMISS & MOTION TO STRIKE "FERRARO SECOND AMENDED MASTER MARRIED PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT" FILED IN CASE IN RE: ASBESTOS LITIGATIN CASE NO 95-50000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/1999
  • DocketPENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 11/08/99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING) OF PLTF(S) OF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00279919 FERRARO & ASSOC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y W/ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less