Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 17:35:58 (UTC).

QUINN, ELLER REE V ARROW TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2002 QUINN, ELLER REE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARROW TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************N-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SIMS , REGINA

QUINN , ELLER REE

SIMS , JESSIE

Defendants and Respondents

URS CONSULTANTS INC - FLORIDA

CENTENNIAL ENGINEERING INC

CROSSROADS ENGINEERING & SURVEYING INC

GERMAN , FERMIN

DAVID FIERRO & ASSOCIATES CORPORATION

URS CORPORATION GROUP CONSULTANTS

WILLIAMS EARTH SCIENCES INC

UNITED RENTALS INC

WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC

R.T. EXPRESS INC DBA ARROW TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

MODERN CONTINENTAL SOUTH INC

WASHINGTON INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES INC

ARROW TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

DELTA CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAMS , LORENZO

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MOWERS , JEFFREY A

FERNANDEZ , GEORGE L

DANIELS ESQ, RICHARD G

DI MATTEO , ANTHONY

DOW ESQ, RANDY R

SCHWARTZ ESQ, ROBERT H

WOLSZTYNIAK JR ES, JOSEPH A

VELASQUEZ ESQ, CARLOS A

FLANAGAN ESQ, JAMES W

 

Court Documents

LETTER

02/24/2009:LETTER

MEDIATION REPORT

02/13/2009:MEDIATION REPORT

LETTER

02/02/2009:LETTER

MOTION TO COMPEL

02/02/2009:MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/28/2009:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

EXHIBIT LIST

12/08/2008:EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/17/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

10/06/2008:NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

MOTION

10/06/2008:MOTION

ORDER

09/17/2008:ORDER

ORDER

09/17/2008:ORDER

COMPLAINT

09/15/2008:COMPLAINT

NOTICE

05/16/2008:NOTICE

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

05/12/2008:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

RE-NOTICE

03/06/2008:RE-NOTICE

NOTICE

02/21/2008:NOTICE

ORDER

09/04/2007:ORDER

PETITION

08/01/2007:PETITION

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER; Notes:Filed by ATTORNEY ROBERT H SCHWARTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:Filed by ATTORNEY ROBERT H SCHWARTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION; Notes:OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023260 PAGE 01030; Notes:CLOSE FILE J COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT-AS STATED-JJCOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:(CORRECTIVE ) 3/31/09 8;30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:3/31/09 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION; Notes:FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT ,APPROVAL OF PAYMENT OF ATTY FEES AND COSTS AND FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING SETTLEMENT FUNDS Filed by PLAINTIFF ELLER REE QUINN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ADDRESSED TO PAUL MCMAHON ESQ, JUDGE STAMPED.

    Read MoreRead Less
247 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2002
  • ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:(ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y ; COMPANY NAME IS R.T. EXPRESS INC DBA ARROW TRANSPORTA ; ATTORNEY NAME IS ROBERT H SCHWARTZ TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2002
  • ANSWER; Notes:(ANSWER) ; COMPANY NAME IS ARROW TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC ; ATTORNEY NAME IS JAMES W FLANAGAN W/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • PENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 09/18/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; PARTY NAME IS FERMIN GERMAN MLD TO ATTY ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 10/04/02 RETURNED 10/15/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS R.T. EXPRESS INC DBA ARROW TRANSPORTA MLD TO ATTY ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 09/30/02 ; NBR OF PAGES = 00000 RET 10/07/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS ARROW TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC MLD TO ATTY ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 09/30/02 ; NBR OF PAGES = 00000 RET 10/07/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00012971 ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y ; NBR OF PAGES = 00013 W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • ADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes:(********CONSOLIDATED CASE**************) W/CA 01-11521 AA PER ORDER DATED 8/21/06, D.E. # 181

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Rentals, Inc, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, LORENZO