Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/25/2019 at 15:42:27 (UTC).

PARK, KEITH H V WASTE MANAGEMENT INC OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 11/02/2001 PARK, KEITH H filed an Other lawsuit against WASTE MANAGEMENT INC OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************I-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PARK , KEITH H

MORALES , WILFREDO

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

WASTE MANAGEMENT INC OF FLORIDA

TEREX MATERIAL HANDLING COPRORATION

WESTAR CAPITAL CORPORATION AKA WESTSTAR CAPITAL CORPORATION

DDJP LEASING LP

LABANON INVESTMENT CORPORATION FKA ENVIROQUIP SYSTEMS INC

ALLIED WASTE HAULING LC

ENVIROQUIP SYSTEMS INC

TEREX CORPORATION

WESTSTAR CAPITAL CORPORATION

RE-TECH

LANZO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY FLORIDA

LANZO LINING SERVICES INC

Respondents and 3Rd Party Defendants

LANZO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY FLORIDA

LANZO LINING SERVICES INC

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RODRIGUEZ , JOSE G

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ASHE ESQ, THOMAS E

MORRIS - WEBSTER ESQ, SAGE

WADSWORTH , CHRISTOPHER W

TUZZIO ESQ, GERARD A

NICKLAUS , EDWARD R

Other Attorneys

PETERSON ESQ, ERIC A

MATES , DONALD E

HICKMAN , JEFFREY R

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

08/20/2008:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

ORDER

02/28/2008:ORDER

RESPONSE TO:

02/11/2008:RESPONSE TO:

MOTION TO COMPEL

01/31/2008:MOTION TO COMPEL

REQUEST FOR COPIES

01/17/2008:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/07/2008:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE

01/07/2008:NOTICE

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/03/2008:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AGREED ORDER

09/04/2007:AGREED ORDER

AFFIDAVIT

07/20/2007:AFFIDAVIT

ORDER

07/20/2007:ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/07/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

05/30/2007:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/18/2007:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/23/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER

03/29/2007:ORDER

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/01/2007:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

ORDER

08/12/2003:ORDER

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 022832 PAGE 01432; Notes:FINAL E GARRISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION; Notes:FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:Associated to docket FDS filed on 2008-08-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING (E GARRISON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE SET ON 8/21/08 AT 9:15 AM. E GARRISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:OF DEPO OF RAUL SMITH Filed by 3RD PARTY DEFENDANT LANZO LINING SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:ON DFT MOTION TO COMPEL DEPO PAUL SMITH & ALLIED WASTES MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST--SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RE-NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:OF ATTY LEWIS A BERNS, SET ON 2/28/08 AT 8:45 AM ON THIRD APRTY DEFT LANZO LINING SERVICE, INC.'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEP OOF RAUL SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:SET ON 2/28/08 AT 8:45 AM ON ALLIED WASTE HAULING LC'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY IN INTEREST Filed by ATTORNEY SETH R. GOLDBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:2/21/08 Filed by ATTORNEY LEWIS A BERNS

    Read MoreRead Less
1,597 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS ALLIED WASTE HAULING LC COUNTER ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 11/27/01 RET'D 12/12/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS WASTE MANAGEMENT INC OF FLORIDA COUNTER ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 11/14/01 RET 11/15/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00003860 JOSE RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y W/O ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • ADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes:COURT NOTES **** CLK TO DOCKET/FILE ALL LEGAL MEMORANDA IN THIS **** **** CASE PER COURT ORDER -- DE #28 - CASE ON "G" DRIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • Receipt Number:CAMB43956; Receipt Amount: $64.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$64.00; total Amount Paid:$64.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • Due Date:05/18/2004; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • Due Date:05/18/2004; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$9.00; Amount Paid:$9.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant