This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/28/2019 at 18:45:57 (UTC).

NIXON, JAMES W V ACANDS INC

Case Summary

On 11/05/1999 NIXON, JAMES W filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ACANDS INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUNSON , CATHERINE M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRUNSON , CATHERINE M

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

NIXON , JAMES W

Respondents and Defendants

CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY

LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY

HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY

PFIZER CORP

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

JOHN CRANE, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

EASTERN REFRACTORIES

NOSROC CORP

SHOOK & FLETCHER INSULATION INC

UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY

A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC.

DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

GARLOCK, INC.

DRESSER INDUSTRIES

HARBISON-WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY

A.W. CHESTERTON

UNITED STATES MINERALS

QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

68 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

JAGOLINZER ESQ, DAVID A

CONZO ESQ, VALERIE A

SAADE , GABRIEL

FERRARO ESQ, JAMES L

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GUERNSEY ESQ, DANIEL BRONSON

COLE , SUSAN J

CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE

MARGOLIS ESQ, LAWRENCE E

SMITH , M STEPHEN

HOLT , MICHAEL R

REISS , MARLENE S

MORLAN ESQ, HAROLD E

Other Attorneys

UNGER ESQ, MARTIN B

FLETCHER , EVELYN M

JOHNSON , VIRGINIA EASLEY

CLARK , TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/02/2016:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/05/2016:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

AFFIDAVIT

06/29/2016:AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

06/23/2016:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/16/2016:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/16/2016:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

06/13/2016:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

06/13/2016:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ORDER REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 @ 8:30 AM (C. BRUNSON 6/9/16)

06/10/2016:ORDER REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 @ 8:30 AM (C. BRUNSON 6/9/16)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/23/2016:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

09/08/2015:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

ORDER

07/20/2012:ORDER

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

07/17/2012:MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/19/2007:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/19/2007:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/06/2002:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2002:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/16/2002:SUMMONS ISSUED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketDISPOSED AFTER OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS F\B PLT, JAMES NIXON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY COLLINGS OBO CBS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:OF CAROLINA SANTANGELO ESQ CERTIFYING PREPARATION FOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE F/B DFT CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF CAROLINA SANTANGELO ESQ CERTIFYING PREPARATION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE F/B DFT CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:O/B/O DEFT JOHN CRANE INC F/B M. STEPHEN SMITH, ESQ. & MICHAEL R. HOLT, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES OF LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, DEFT F/B BICE COLE LAW FIRM, P.L., MELANIE CHUNG-TIMS, ESQ., SUSAN J. COLE, B.C.S., ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES OF HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, DEFT F/B BICE COLE LAW FIRM, P.L. SUSAN J. COLE, B.C.S., ESQ., & MELANIE CHUNG-TIMS, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE F/B ATTY CLARK OBO DFT CLEAVER-BROOKS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE F/B ATTY CLARK OBO DFT CLEAVER-BROOKS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2000
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF DFT WR GRACE OF ADOPTION OF MOTION TO DISMISS,STRIKE AND ANSWERS TO COMPLAINT AS FILED IN 95-50,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2000
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF DFT JOHN CRANE INC ADOPTION OF STATEMENT OF NON WAIVER & ANSWER TO FERRARO MARRIED AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2000
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF APPEARANCE OF LAWRENCE MARGOLIS ESQ OBO DFT JOHN CRANE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2000
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF DEFT A W CHESTERTON CO OF ADOPTION OF MASTER STANDARD ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, MOTION TO DISMISS , ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B JAMES W AND TERESA NIXON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketPENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 11/05/99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING) OF PLTF(S) OF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketRECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00279807 FERRARO & ASSOC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes:COURT NOTES **CASE STAYED DE#35**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less