Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 01:34:54 (UTC).

MILANI, LUCIA V PALM BEACH COUNTY

Case Summary

On 08/21/2002 MILANI, LUCIA filed an Other lawsuit against PALM BEACH COUNTY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************E-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

MILANI AND MILANI HOLDINGS LIMITED BY ASSIGNEE

MILANI , LUCIA

Defendants and Respondents

BOCA HIGHLAND CENTER INC

MARCUS , KAREN T

MCCARTY , MARY

AARONSON , BURT

NEWELL , WARREN H

MASILOTTI , TONY

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PALM BEACH COUNTY FLORIDA

GREEN , ADDIE L

ROBERTS , CAROL A

PALM BEACH COUNTY

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SWEETAPPLE , ROBERT A

ADILI ESQ, RONNIE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ROSENBAUM ESQ, DANIEL S

WILLIAMS ESQ, KEITH L

BAUMANN ESQ, ANDREW J

 

Court Documents

DISPOSED/RETURNED EVIDENCE

03/14/2014:DISPOSED/RETURNED EVIDENCE

CLERK'S NOTE

12/03/2013:CLERK'S NOTE

CLERK'S NOTE

10/04/2013:CLERK'S NOTE

CLERK'S NOTE

10/04/2013:CLERK'S NOTE

RECORD

08/11/2008:RECORD

EXHIBIT CHECK IN RECEIPT

05/19/2008:EXHIBIT CHECK IN RECEIPT

MANDATE

03/25/2008:MANDATE

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 022493 PAGE 01539

03/06/2008:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 022493 PAGE 01539

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

03/07/2007:ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

EXHIBIT CHECK OUT RECEIPT

03/05/2007:EXHIBIT CHECK OUT RECEIPT

NOTICE TRANSMIT RECORD APPEAL

03/05/2007:NOTICE TRANSMIT RECORD APPEAL

TRANSCRIPT

02/26/2007:TRANSCRIPT

TRANSCRIPT

02/26/2007:TRANSCRIPT

TRANSCRIPT

02/26/2007:TRANSCRIPT

TRANSCRIPT

02/23/2007:TRANSCRIPT

TRANSCRIPT

02/23/2007:TRANSCRIPT

TRANSCRIPT

02/23/2007:TRANSCRIPT

ORDER

02/09/2007:ORDER

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISPOSED/RETURNED EVIDENCE; Notes:BY JASON KAUFMAN, DEPUTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Notes:FROM ROBERT SWEETAPPLE DTD 11/20/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:RECEIPT OF EXHIBITS OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.430 (F)(2) OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.430 (F)(2) OF DEFT PALM BEACH COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD; Notes:REASSEMBLED 4D06-4597

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT CHECK IN RECEIPT; Notes:FROM APPEALS DTD 5/12/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE; Notes:4D06-4597 DECISION FILED 3-24-08 REVERSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER; Notes:FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA SENT FORM JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • REDISPOSED; Notes:Associated to docket FJUD filed on 2008-03-06

    Read MoreRead Less
210 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2002
  • PENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 08/21/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS PALM BEACH COUNTY BY SERVING THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS COUNTER ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 08/26/02 RET 8/28/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2002
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00001634 ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 LAW OFFICE OF SWEETAPPLE BROEKER & VARKAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2002
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2002
  • PETITION; Notes:(PETITION) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00005 FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2007
  • Receipt Number:CAMB137826; Receipt Amount: $314.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • Receipt Number:CAMB130127; Receipt Amount: $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2006
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$365.50; total Amount Paid:$365.50; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2006
  • Due Date:12/20/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$314.50; Amount Paid:$314.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • Due Date:11/17/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sweetapple, Robert A, ESQ.