Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/31/2019 at 00:10:56 (UTC).

LUKENDA, RICHARD J V SKY BANK

Case Summary

On 10/16/2002 LUKENDA, RICHARD J filed an Other lawsuit against SKY BANK. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL , LISA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************H-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMALL , LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SCHRODER , COURTNEY

LUKENDA , RICHARD J

SUFFICOOL , RICHARD L

OSTROMECKI , CHRISTOPHER

SCHNITZER , FRED

Defendants and Respondents

GOTHAM BANK OF NEW YORK

JAFFE SIEGEL PA

VAUL JR, JOHN J

BANK OF NEW YORK COMPANY INC

JOHN J VAUL JR & ASSOCIATES INC

BDO SEIDMAN

STERLING BANCORP

FELDMAN SHERB & CO PC

SKY BANK

SIEGEL & COMPANY INC

VIDERE GROUP

JAWIN , MICHELE

PENINSULA BANK

HIXSON MARIN DESANCTIS & COMPANY PA

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SCHOEPPL , CARL F

CLOUGH ESQ, JOHN C

SCHOEPPL ESQ, CARL F

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DEMAHY ESQ, PETE L

KLEIN , JASON

SOLMS ESQ, WILLAIM O

 

Court Documents

ORDER REGARDING PLTS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL: DENIED. DTD 2-24-17 L SMALL

02/24/2017:ORDER REGARDING PLTS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL: DENIED. DTD 2-24-17 L SMALL

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/15/2017:NOTICE OF HEARING

VERIFIED MOTION

02/02/2017:VERIFIED MOTION

EXHIBIT LIST

01/20/2017:EXHIBIT LIST

REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

01/12/2017:REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

JURY QUESTIONS

01/11/2017:JURY QUESTIONS

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/14/2016:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE F/B DFT FELDMAN SHERB AND CO

06/24/2016:MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE F/B DFT FELDMAN SHERB AND CO

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/05/2015:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION

07/29/2015:MOTION

EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

07/28/2015:EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/27/2015:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

05/14/2015:NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/27/2014:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/24/2013:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/02/2012:NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

09/27/2010:NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

08/05/2010:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

144 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 28981 PAGE 665-666; Notes:ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT WITHDRAWING MOTION TO TAX COSTS WAIVING RIGHTS TO APPEAL AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUICE FINAL JUDGMENT VACATED NUNC PRO TUNC; MOTION TO TAX COSTS DENIED AS MOOT; PLT'S HAVE WAIVED THEIR RESPECTIVE RIGHTS TO APPEAL WITH PREJUDICE; ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND EACH PARTY AGREEING TO BEAR THEIR OWN RESPECTIVE FEES AND COSTS L SMALL DTD 3/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION; Notes:(JOINT) FOR ENTRY OF ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT WITHDRAWING MOTION TO TAX COSTS, WAIVING RIGHTS TO APPEAL, AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE F\B PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DISPOSED BY JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 28915 PAGE 869-872; Notes:PLTS, RICHARD LUDENDA, RIVHARD SUFFICOOL AND CHRISTOPHER OSTROMECKI SHALL TAKE NOTHING FROM THIS ACTION AND DFT, FELDMAN SHERG & CO A NEW YORK CORPORATION SHALL GO HENCE WITHOUT DAY. DTD 2-24-17 L SMALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER REGARDING PLTS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL: DENIED. DTD 2-24-17 L SMALL; Notes:REGARDING PLTS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL: DENIED. DTD 2-24-17 L SMALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:AND INITIAL OBJECTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS F\B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:(SPECIAL SET) ON 2/24/2017 AT 8:30 AM ROOM 11C RE: MOTION ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FILED FEBRUARY 2 2017 F/B DFT FELDMAN SHERB & CO PC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:IN OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL F/B DFT FELDMAN SHERB & CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ( FILED THURSDAY, JANUARY 26, 2017 ) FEBRUARY 24, 2017 @ 8:30AM IN CTRM 11C L SMALL DTD 2/8/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:ON 02/24/2017 8:30AM COURTROOM11C F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
430 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS GOTHAM BANK OF NEW YORK **TO ATTY UPS** CV ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 01/09/03 RET'D 1/27/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS STERLING BANCORP **TO ATTY UPS** CV ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 01/09/03 RET'D 1/27/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS JOHN J VAUL JR & ASSOCIATES INC **TO ATTY UPS** CV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS HIXSON MARIN DESANCTIS & COMPANY PA **TO ATTY UPS** CV ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 12/11/02 **SEE DE 17** RTND 1/3/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS SIEGEL & COMPANY INC **TO ATTY UPS** CV ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 12/11/02 SEE DE #17 RTND 1/3/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS JAFFE SIEGEL PA **TO ATTY UPS** CV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • PENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 10/16/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00006561 ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 QUARLES & BRADY LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = N ; NBR OF PAGES = 00020 W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Klein (esq)