Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/23/2019 at 15:32:54 (UTC).

LEIGH, DIANA V MAGANA, IGNACIO

Case Summary

On 07/03/2001 LEIGH, DIANA filed an Other lawsuit against MAGANA, IGNACIO. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************N-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant

LEIGH , DIANA

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

SAYEGH , BASSAM

LEIGH , DIANA

UNITED SURGEONS PA

GOMEZ , HELDO

GM PHYSICIANS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

JUPITER MEDICAL CENTER INC DBA JUPITER MEDICAL CENTER

MAGANA , IGNACIO

IGNACIO MAGANA MD PA

ANESTHESIOLOGY OF JUPITER PA

GARCIA , CLAUDIA

HELDO GOMEZ, M.D., P.A., AND GM PHYSICIAN MANAGEMENT CORP.

GRAVEL , CLAUDE

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ALLEY ESQ, LINDA A

SEROPIAN , DIRAN V

SCHLESINGER ESQ, SCOTT P

CARUSO ESQ, EDNA LOUISE

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

VIERGEVER ESQ, WILLIAM T

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

06/12/2013:NOTICE

NOTICE

06/12/2013:NOTICE

NOTICE

06/12/2013:NOTICE

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

09/21/2009:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/24/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

04/11/2008:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

RE-NOTICE

03/25/2008:RE-NOTICE

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

03/19/2008:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/06/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO COMPEL

03/06/2008:MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

01/16/2008:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/06/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

RECORD

08/09/2007:RECORD

NOTICE

08/07/2007:NOTICE

RECORD

08/07/2007:RECORD

RECORD

08/07/2007:RECORD

NOTICE

07/05/2007:NOTICE

MANDATE

07/02/2007:MANDATE

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2015
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$57.50 was made on receipt CAMB971297.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • VOIDED RECEIPT; Notes:Receipt Number CAMB125189 has been voided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISPOSED/RETURNED EVIDENCE; Notes:BY JASON KAUFMAN, DEPUTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:NOTICE OF DISPOSED EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:NOTICE OF DISPOSAL OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.430 (F)(2) PLAINTIFF: DIANA LEIGH Filed by PLAINTIFF DIANA LEIGH. Filed by APPELLANT DIANA LEIGH. Filed by APPELLANT DIANA LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:NOTICE OF DISPOSAL OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.430 (F)(2) DEFENDANT : JUPITER MEDICAL CENTER INC DBA JUPITER MEDIC Filed By DEFENDANT JUPITER MEDICAL CENTER INC DBA JUPITER MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:NOTICE OF DISPOSAL OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.430 (F)(2), DEFENDANT: BASSAM SAYEGH Filed by APPELLANT BASSAM SAYEGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:NOTICE OF DISPOSAL OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.430 (F)(2) DEFENDANT: BASSAM SAYEGH Filed by APPELLANT BASSAM SAYEGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:NOTICE OF DISPOSAL OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.430 (F)(21) PLAINTIFF: DIANA LEIGH Filed by PLAINTIFF DIANA LEIGH. Filed by APPELLANT DIANA LEIGH. Filed by APPELLANT DIANA LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:NOTICE OF DISPOSAL OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.430 (FL(2); DFT; BASSAM SAYEGH Filed by APPELLANT DIANA LEIGH. Filed by APPELLANT DIANA LEIGH. Filed by PLAINTIFF DIANA LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
1,667 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2006
  • Due Date:10/08/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2006
  • Due Date:06/15/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$26.50; Amount Paid:$26.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • Due Date:05/12/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$6.50; Amount Paid:$6.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • Due Date:05/12/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • Due Date:01/27/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$3,479.50; Amount Paid:$3,479.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2005
  • Due Date:12/29/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$2.50; Amount Paid:$1.00; Amount Balance:$1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2005
  • Due Date:11/17/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2005
  • Due Date:11/17/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.50; Amount Paid:$5.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2005
  • Due Date:09/08/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2005
  • Due Date:09/08/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$11.50; Amount Paid:$11.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUPITER MEDICAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seropian, Diran Vahn