This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/28/2019 at 18:47:47 (UTC).

JOHNSON, BRUCE L V ACANDS INC

Case Summary

On 11/05/1999 JOHNSON, BRUCE L filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ACANDS INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************G-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JOHNSON , BRUCE L

JOHNSON , MARTHA

Respondents and Defendants

GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION

A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES INC

LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY

HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY

UNITED STOKER

CONGOLEUM CORPORATION

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

EASTERN REFRACTORIES

NOSROC CORP

DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

DRESSER INDUSTRIES

HARBISON-WALKER REFRACTORIES COMPANY

SHOOK & FLETCHER INSULATION

A.W. CHESTERTON

GARLOCK INC

UNITED STATES MINERALS

QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GALARDI ESQ, DINO

FERRARO ESQ, JAMES L

JAGOLINZER ESQ, DAVID A

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MORLAN ESQ, HAROLD E

COLE , SUSAN J

CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE

TEMPESTA ESQ, CAROL M

SPINTHOURAKIS ESQ, FRANCES

FLETCHER , EVELYN M

Other Attorneys

COCKREN , ROBERT W

GUERNSEY ESQ, DANIEL BRONSON

BICE ESQ, JEAN A

COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

EVERTJR ESQ, C MICHAEL

MARGOLIS ESQ, LAWRENCE E

 

Court Documents

REPORT

09/12/2016:REPORT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/12/2016:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

REPORT

09/12/2016:REPORT

REPORT

07/18/2016:REPORT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/23/2016:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ORDER REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SEPTEMBER 27, 2016 AT 8:45AM COURTROOM 9C. D HAFELE 6-14-16

06/16/2016:ORDER REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SEPTEMBER 27, 2016 AT 8:45AM COURTROOM 9C. D HAFELE 6-14-16

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/16/2016:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/16/2016:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/04/2016:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

09/08/2015:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

07/17/2012:MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE

11/06/2008:NOTICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/19/2007:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/19/2007:REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/12/2007:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/08/2007:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/23/2007:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/21/2007:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT; Notes:CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT (F/B DFT CBS CORP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketDISPOSED AFTER OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT; Notes:(CASE MANAGEMENT) F/B DFT JOHN CRANE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT; Notes:CASE MANGAGEMENT REPORT F/B DFT CBS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:& DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS O/B/O DEFT CBS CORP FKA VIACOM, INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORP FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP F/B CHRISTOPHER J.M. COLLINGS, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SEPTEMBER 27, 2016 AT 8:45AM COURTROOM 9C. D HAFELE 6-14-16; Notes:REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SEPTEMBER 27, 2016 AT 8:45AM COURTROOM 9C. D HAFELE 6-14-16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:OF BICE COLE LAW FIRM, P.L., MELANIE CHUNG-TIMS, ESQ. SUSAN J. COLE, B.C.S., ESQ. O/B/O DEFT LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:OF BICE COLE LAW FIRM, P.L., SUSAN J. COLE, B.C.S., ESQ., MELANIE CHUNG-TIMS, ESQ. O/B/O DEFT HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DFT KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC ONLY; F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2000
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Notes:(MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) OF DEFT, W.R.GRACE & COMPANY, ON PUNITIVE DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2000
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:(MOTION TO DISMISS) ; COMPANY NAME IS W.R. GRACE & COMPANY MOTION TO STRIKE AND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2000
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF DFT W R GRACE OF ADOPTION OF WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST AS FILED IN 95-50,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2000
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF DEFT A W CHESTERTON CO OF ADOPTION OF MASTER STANDARD ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, MOTION TO DISMISS , ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketPENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 11/05/99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING) OF PLTF AS TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketRECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00279799 FERRARO AND ASSOC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y W/ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/1999
  • DocketADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes:COURT NOTES **CASE STAYED DE#34**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less