Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/01/2019 at 00:02:03 (UTC).

JANELLO, GLENN V NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)

Case Summary

On 12/20/2002 JANELLO, GLENN filed an Other lawsuit against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION AMTRAK. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is OFTEDAL , RICHARD L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

OFTEDAL , RICHARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JANELLO , GLENN

Defendants and Respondents

PALM BEACH COUNTY FLORIDA

TRI-COUNTY COMMUTER RAIL AUTHORITY

CITY OF BOCA RATON FLORIDA

NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)

WACKENHUT CORPORATION

CSX CORPORATION INC

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORATION

HERZOG TRANSIT SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ITZLER ESQ, PETER E

CONE ESQ, A CLARK

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PETRICK , AMY TAYLOR

MAHL ESQ, JEFFREY F

BARRY , JAMES CAIRNS

MOKRIS ESQ, PHILIP C

FLEMING ESQ, DANIEL J

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 28566 PAGE 722-723

09/09/2016:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 28566 PAGE 722-723

NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR ARBITRATION F/B/PLTF

05/04/2016:NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR ARBITRATION F/B/PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

04/11/2016:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ORDER RESETTING

03/15/2016:ORDER RESETTING

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/08/2016:ORDER SETTING HEARING

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

02/25/2016:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

MOTION

01/15/2016:MOTION

WITNESS LIST

05/29/2015:WITNESS LIST

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/30/2014:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

07/24/2014:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION

06/30/2014:MOTION

RESPONSE TO:

02/27/2012:RESPONSE TO:

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

02/07/2012:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/07/2012:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

05/17/2010:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/10/2010:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

ORDER

11/02/2009:ORDER

AFFIDAVIT

10/26/2009:AFFIDAVIT

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 28566 PAGE 722-723; Notes:ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DFT NATIONAL RAILROAD AGAINST PLTF. DFT GO HENCE W/OUT DAY. DTD 9/8/16 RICHARD OFTEDAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING ORE TENUS MOTION FOR TRIAL DE NOVO - DENIED R OFTEDAL DTD 9/08/16; Notes:ORE TENUS MOTION FOR TRIAL DE NOVO - DENIED R OFTEDAL DTD 9/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:ON 9/8/16 @ 8:45 AM F/B/DEFT NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A JUDGMENT TO CONFIRM THE ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY NATIONAL RAILROAD; Notes:FOR ENTRY OF A JUDGMENT TO CONFIRM THE ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY NATIONAL RAILROAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE; Notes:PLT'S AMENDED DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES F/B DFT NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM A PORTION OF TRIAL DOCKET FILED BY PLT; Notes:TO BE EXCUSED FROM A PORTION OF TRIAL DOCKET FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WITNESS LIST; Notes:AMENDED DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES F\B PLT, GLENN JANELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE; Notes:PLTS DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES AND DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES- F/B DFT NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ARBITRATION JUNE 30, 2016 10:00 AM - 4:00 PM F\B PLT; Notes:OF ARBITRATION JUNE 30, 2016 10:00 AM - 4:00 PM F\B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR ARBITRATION F/B/PLTF; Notes:OF SELECTION FOR ARBITRATION F/B/PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
417 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2003
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(AMENDED) OF PLT GLENN JANELLO AGAINST NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER COPRORATION, HERZOG TRANSIT SERVICES INC, CSX CORPORATION INC, WACKENHUT CORPORATION, TRI-COUNTY COMMUTER RAIL AUTHORITY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, PALM BEACH COUNTY FLORIDA, CITY OF BOCA RATON FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00342553 ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 BY CONE LAW FIRM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • PENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 12/20/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • COMPLAINT BOOK 016714 PAGE 01711; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y ; NBR OF PAGES = 00008 NO ATTACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Receipt Number:CAMB912428; Receipt Amount: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • Receipt Number:CAMB362611; Receipt Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$150.00; total Amount Paid:$150.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Due Date:06/25/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • Due Date:12/04/2009; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CSX Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION is a litigant