Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/31/2019 at 23:52:20 (UTC).

INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA V LUXURY CARS OF PALM BEACH INC

Case Summary

On 12/19/2002 INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA filed an Other lawsuit against LUXURY CARS OF PALM BEACH INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************N-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA

Defendants and Respondents

MOTTO SR, MICHAEL A

BORNSCHEIN , ROBERT J

MCSWAIN , MILTON BROCK

BANK ONE CREDIT COMPANY

H M BROWN & ASSOCIATES INC

KALOGEROPOULOS , CAROLE

PEOPLES CREDIT UNION

CERESA , DERIS

DEUTSCH , GERALDINE

LUXURY CARS OF PALM BEACH INC

AUTOPARK AUTOMOBILE SUPERSTORE

DON L LEASING FLORIDA LLC

GANZI , MARC

SMITH , HUBERT W

MASCIARELLI , THOMAS

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SEARS ESQ, JAMES W

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

QUINN , ROBERT M

MILLER ESQ, THOMAS B

BROWN ESQ, J KENT

DIAZ , ROY A

KURKIN ESQ, ALEX

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

09/09/2013:RETURNED MAIL

LETTER

08/22/2013:LETTER

RETURNED MAIL

08/12/2013:RETURNED MAIL

ORDER

08/03/2012:ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/10/2012:NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURNED MAIL

03/20/2012:RETURNED MAIL

MOTION

04/19/2010:MOTION

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

07/16/2009:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

05/06/2009:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

MOTION

05/06/2009:MOTION

RETURNED MAIL

01/09/2009:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

01/09/2009:RETURNED MAIL

ORDER

12/12/2008:ORDER

CROSS CLAIM

11/21/2008:CROSS CLAIM

MOTION

11/10/2008:MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/17/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

07/03/2008:MOTION

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ORDER DISMISSING CASE ...CLERK TO FILE PER JUDGE COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ORDERING DIMISSING CASE ...CLERK TO FILE PER JUDGE COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER; Notes:TO JUDGE COX CLERK FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 26278 PAGE 865; Notes:J COX DJ CLOSE FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:DERIS CERASA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:LUXURY CARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR 8-22-13 AT 8:30AM. J COX 7-30-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:ON H.M. BROWN ASSOCIATES, INC.'S PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONERS FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS: GRANTED. C BRUNSON 2 CC TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION; Notes:FOR APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONERS FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS Filed by DEFENDANT H M BROWN & ASSOCIATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
202 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2003
  • Receipt Number:CAMB27752; Receipt Amount: $25,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$25,310.00; total Amount Paid:$25,310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Due Date:07/23/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • Due Date:05/30/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • Due Date:02/09/2009; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • Due Date:11/24/2008; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2005
  • Due Date:12/02/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$15.00; Amount Paid:$15.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2003
  • Due Date:11/26/2003; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$255.00; Amount Paid:$255.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2003
  • Due Date:11/26/2003; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$25,000.00; Amount Paid:$25,000.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2003
  • Due Date:11/26/2003; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Indemnity Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases where BANK ONE-PLATINUM ETAL is a litigant