Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/31/2019 at 19:37:46 (UTC).

HALMOS, PETER V HALMOS, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 11/27/2002 HALMOS, PETER filed an Other lawsuit against HALMOS, STEVEN. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************J-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

PAH CO

HALMOS , PETER

HALMOS TRADING & INVESTMENT CO

Defendants and Respondents

21 WEST LLC

HALMOS , STEVEN

MEDITERRANEAN VILLAGE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

HALMOS PROPERTIES INC

SJH CYPRESS INC

PETER HALMOS IRREVOCABLE TRUST

Respondent and 3Rd Party Defendant

PETER HALMOS IRREVOCABLE TRUST

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHARPSTEIN , RICHARD A

HAUSER , ROBERT JEFFREY

ROGOW ESQ, BRUCE S

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NACHWALTER ESQ, MICHAEL

LANDON III ESQ, ROBERT D W

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION

04/02/2009:OBJECTION

NOTICE

03/24/2009:NOTICE

INVOICE

06/30/2008:INVOICE

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

05/20/2008:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

05/20/2008:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

EXHIBIT LIST

05/20/2008:EXHIBIT LIST

MOTION

05/13/2008:MOTION

MOTION

05/13/2008:MOTION

ORDER SETTING HEARING

02/15/2008:ORDER SETTING HEARING

EXHIBIT LIST

03/13/2007:EXHIBIT LIST

MOTION

03/07/2007:MOTION

MOTION

02/28/2007:MOTION

ORDER

02/22/2007:ORDER

EMERGENCY MOTION

02/21/2007:EMERGENCY MOTION

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

02/05/2007:ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/02/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE

01/31/2007:NOTICE

ORDER SETTING HEARING

01/31/2007:ORDER SETTING HEARING

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 024461 PAGE 00464; Notes:CONFIRMING ORDER RELEASING ESCROW FUNDS-RROSENBERG-DBO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • EMERGENCY MOTION; Notes:FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON APRIL 8, 2011 (UP 4-4-11) Filed by APPELLANT PETER HALMOS. Filed by PLAINTIFF PETER HALMOS. Filed by APPELLANT PETER HALMOS. Filed by APPELLANT PETER HALMOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:ON LINE SCHEDULING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING RROSENBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION; Notes:FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JMT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION; Notes:TO NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION... Filed by ATTORNEY RICHARD A SHARPSTEIN. Filed by ATTORNEY RICHARD A SHARPSTEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF RELATED ACTION Filed by DEFENDANT SJH CYPRESS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF ADOPTION OF ARGUMENTS Filed by PLAINTIFF PETER HALMOS. Filed by APPELLANT PETER HALMOS. Filed by APPELLANT PETER HALMOS. Filed by APPELLANT PETER HALMOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF ADOPTION ARGUMENTS RAISED BY PAH CO. Filed by 3RD PARTY DEFENDANT PETER HALMOS IRREVOCABLE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION; Notes:TO VACATE ORDER AWARDING................IN ADDITION TO ATTY'S FEES. Filed by ATTORNEY RICHARD A SHARPSTEIN. Filed by ATTORNEY RICHARD A SHARPSTEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
473 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2006
  • Due Date:10/23/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • Due Date:10/18/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$19.50; Amount Paid:$19.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • Due Date:10/18/2006; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2004
  • Due Date:12/23/2004; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$332.50; Amount Paid:$332.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2004
  • Due Date:11/10/2004; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2004
  • Due Date:11/10/2004; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$12.50; Amount Paid:$12.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2003
  • Due Date:12/05/2003; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2003
  • Due Date:09/15/2003; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$48.00; Amount Paid:$48.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2003
  • Due Date:08/05/2003; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2003
  • Due Date:08/05/2003; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less