Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/25/2019 at 17:10:15 (UTC).

GOLDCOAST FISHMAN & STASHAK MD PA DBA V PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/09/2001 GOLDCOAST FISHMAN STASHAK MD PA DBA filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************B-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SOUTH MIAMI MEDICAL ARTS CENTER INC

GILMER-COX-SCHWAB-BOOT ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATION PA

JOSE GARCIA DC PA

NATURAL HEALTHCARE CLINIC INC

GOLDCOAST ORTHOPEDICS ADBA

SILVERMAN WENDER KOONIN EPSTEIN & GARCIA PA NKA

LEE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC

GOLDCOAST ORTHOPEDICS BY CORP

ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH BROWARD PA

TOTAL ORTHOPAEDIC CARE PA

KOHL , ABRAHAM K

ST AUGUSTINE PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES INC

GOLDCOAST ORTHOPEDICS AND REHABILITATION BY CORP

Defendants and Respondents

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO

PROGRESSIVE CONSUMERS INSURANCE COMPANY

BEECH STREET CORPORATION

Respondent and 3Rd Party Defendant

BEECH STREET CORPORATION

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HEARON ESQ, WILLIAM C

SEARCY ESQ, CHRISTIAN DIETRICH

STEWART ESQ, LARRY S

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WEIHMULLER ESQ, JOHN W

WILKE , JOHN J

ANANIA ESQ, FRANCIS A

Other Attorneys

STEWART , TODD S

WATSON ESQ, LAURA M

MARKS ESQ, GARY

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM

04/27/2004:MEMORANDUM

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/22/2004:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE

02/03/2004:NOTICE

NOTICE

02/03/2004:NOTICE

NOTICE

01/15/2004:NOTICE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/01/2003:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/01/2003:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/01/2003:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/01/2003:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/01/2003:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE

11/26/2003:NOTICE

ORDER

08/13/2003:ORDER

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

04/22/2003:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

ORDER SETTING HEARING

12/10/2002:ORDER SETTING HEARING

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

03/21/2002:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

02/22/2002:MEMORANDUM OF LAW

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/21/2002:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/11/2002:MOTION TO DISMISS

296 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2005
  • DISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes:Associated to docket FDS filed on 2005-12-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:CLOSE FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION AND ORDER; Notes:(JOINT) GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT W/OUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT W/O PREJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION; Notes:JOINT FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT W/O PREJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:OF HEARING ON 6/22/04 Filed by PLAINTIFF GOLDCOAST FISHMAN & STASHAK MD PA DBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:AS TO DEFTS, PROGRESSIVE CASULTY INS CO, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO, PROGRESSIVE CONSUMERS INS CO, PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INS CO, THE PROGRESSIVE CORP, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INS CO, NATIONAL CONTINENTAL INS CO AND PROGRESSIVE AUTO PRO INS CO, HAVE AMICABLY COMPROMISED, SETTLED AND RESOLVED ALL CLAIMS IN THIS ACTION. **STILL PENDING AS TO 3RD PARTIES** Filed by PLAINTIFF DRS. FISHMAN & STASHAK MDS PA DBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:AND GARY MARKS, ESQ. OF ADDITIONAL ATTORNEYS Filed By ATTORNEY LAURA M WATSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Notes:AMENDED ON BEHALF OF STEWART TILGHMAN FOX & BIANCHI, P.A. WILLIAM C. HERON P.A. AND TODD S. STEWART P.A. AND NOT ON BEHALF OF ANY OTHER PTY OR PERSON Filed by ATTORNEY CHRISTIAN DIETRICH SEARCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF CHARGING LIEN Filed by ATTORNEY WILLIAM C HEARON

    Read MoreRead Less
302 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Notes:(NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ATTORNEY:) ; COMPANY NAME IS PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY ; ATTORNEY NAME IS FRANCIS A ANANIA OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(AMENDED COMPLAINT) OF PLTF AS TO SAME DFT PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • PENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 11/09/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY COUNTER ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 12/14/01 RTND 01-08-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING/SERVING INTERROGATORIES) OF PLTF TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION; Notes:(REQUEST TO PRODUCE) OF PLTF TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:(REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS) OF PLTF TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00017495 SLAWSON CUNNINGHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = N W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lee Chiropractic Clinic, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMAPNY is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. AUGUSTINE PHYSICIANS ASSOCIATES, INC. D/B/A MONAHAN CHIROPRACTIC MEDICAL CLINICS A/A/O ZAK CARTER is a litigant