Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/25/2019 at 23:42:38 (UTC).

GOLDBERG, ROBERT A V STEDMAN, KAREN E

Case Summary

On 12/07/2001 GOLDBERG, ROBERT A filed an Other lawsuit against STEDMAN, KAREN E. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************J-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Respondents and Petitioners

LAND CONNECTION INC BY SHAREHOLDER

GOLDBERG , ROBERT A

LUBE CONNECTION INC BY SHAREHOLDER

Defendants, Respondents and Petitioners

LUBE CONNECTION INC BY DIRECTOR

LAND CONNECTION INC BY SHAREHOLDER

FLEURY , MARSHALL

STEDMAN , KAREN E

LAND CONNECTION INC BY DIRECTOR

STEDMAN-FLEURY CPA PA

LUBE CONNECTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Respondent, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GORMAN ESQ, DAVID L

MASCIARELLA II , RAYMOND MICHAEL

KLETT JR, STANLEY DALE

MONCHICK ESQ, MICHAEL J

STILL JR ESQ, JOSEPH KOGER

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER

06/23/2014:AGREED ORDER

COPY

06/03/2014:COPY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

04/30/2014:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/29/2014:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER

04/01/2014:ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/20/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

03/20/2014:MOTION

COPY

03/11/2014:COPY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/27/2014:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ANSWER

02/26/2014:ANSWER

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/12/2014:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

02/12/2014:WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

ORDER

12/19/2013:ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/11/2013:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

12/11/2013:MOTION

COPY

11/22/2013:COPY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

11/12/2013:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

10/23/2013:WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER; Notes:AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS PURSUANT TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT THE GARNISHEE, JC EXPRESS LUBES, II INC SHALL PAY TO THE PLT, ROBERT A GOLDBERG THE SUM OF $2968.00 BELONGING TO B&B LEASING...SEE ORDER; JUDGE MCCARTHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS PURSUANT TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF ROBERT A GOLDBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $100.00 on Check Number 56528 to JC EXPRESS LUBES II INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY; Notes:DISB REQUEST FOR JC EXPRESS LUBES II INC, ANSWER EFILED 5/19/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF A COPY OF THE GARNISHEE'S, JC EXPRESS LUBES II, INC.'S ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT COPIES OF WHICH ARE ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBITS 1 AND 2, RESPECTIVELY FILED BY ATTY MASCIARELLA Filed by ATTORNEY RAYMOND MICHAEL MASCIARELLA II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • ANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Notes:FILED BY JC EXPRESS LUBES II, INC -X-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes:CPY OF THE MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND C CPY OF THE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT. F/B ATTY OF PLT Filed by ATTORNEY RAYMOND MICHAEL MASCIARELLA II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SERVED ON JC EXPRESS LUBES II INC ON 4/28/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Notes:JC EXPRESS LUBES II, INC-COUNTER-- WGA-14-001056

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR WRIT; Notes:OF GARNISHMENT. F/B PLTF Filed by PLAINTIFF ROBERT A GOLDBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
267 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2014
  • Due Date:04/25/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$103.00; Amount Paid:$103.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • Due Date:04/25/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$3.00; Amount Paid:$3.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • Due Date:04/25/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$85.00; Amount Paid:$85.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Due Date:03/20/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • Due Date:02/12/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$103.00; Amount Paid:$103.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • Due Date:02/12/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$3.00; Amount Paid:$3.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • Due Date:02/12/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$85.00; Amount Paid:$85.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • Due Date:10/23/2013; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$103.00; Amount Paid:$103.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • Due Date:10/23/2013; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$3.00; Amount Paid:$3.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • Due Date:10/23/2013; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$85.00; Amount Paid:$85.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLETT JR, STANLEY DALE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASCIARELLA, RAYMOND MICHAEL