Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/25/2019 at 22:15:36 (UTC).

GARDNER, ANDREA V COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/30/2001 GARDNER, ANDREA filed an Other lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************G-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

GARDNER , AMY A MINOR

GARDNER , ANDREA

GARDNER , AMANDA

GARDNER , AUSTIN A MINOR

GARDNER , AVERY A MINOR

GARDNER , RONDALL

Defendants and Respondents

PINDER TROUTMAN CONSULTING INC

FREDERICK W SCHWARTZ PE

THOMAS B CUSHING DBA THOMAS B CUSHING DEMOLITION

SHAH DROTOS & ASSOCIATES PA

TINTER ASSOCIATES INC

CCL CONSULTANTS INC

THE TOWN OF LANTANA

SCWARTZ , FREDERICK W

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

THOMAS B CUSHING DEMOLITION INC

PALM BEACH COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KREUSLER-WALSH , JANE

DAVIS ESQ, MICHAEL BETHUNE

BLEVINS , JASON P

SMITH ESQ, CLARK WICKHAM

JOHNSON , WILLIAM EUGENE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FOLINO ESQ, JILL A

PETERSON ESQ, ERIC A

 

Court Documents

TRANSCRIPT

12/17/2007:TRANSCRIPT

TRANSCRIPT

12/17/2007:TRANSCRIPT

TRANSCRIPT

12/17/2007:TRANSCRIPT

TRANSCRIPT

12/17/2007:TRANSCRIPT

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

09/28/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

OBJECTION

07/31/2007:OBJECTION

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

07/27/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

MOTION

07/20/2007:MOTION

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/17/2007:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

07/16/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

07/16/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

07/03/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

SUBPOENA RETURNED / NOT SERVED

07/03/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / NOT SERVED

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

07/03/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/02/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE

06/29/2007:NOTICE

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

06/29/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/25/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

410 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:LISTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • RECORD; Notes:REASSEMBLED 4D07-4109 SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • RECORD; Notes:REASSEMBLED 4D07-4109

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:OF ITEMS CHECKED IN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE; Notes:4D07-4109 5/22/09 DECISION FILED 5/6/09 AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • TRUE COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$14.50 was made on receipt CAMB222957.

    Read MoreRead Less
1,617 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2001
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2001
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • Receipt Number:CAMB222957; Receipt Amount: $14.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2008
  • Receipt Number:CAMB193625; Receipt Amount: $737.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2008
  • Receipt Number:CAMB193624; Receipt Amount: $737.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2007
  • Receipt Number:CAMB177542; Receipt Amount: $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2008
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,541.00; total Amount Paid:$1,541.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2008
  • Due Date:06/10/2008; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$14.50; Amount Paid:$14.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • Due Date:12/21/2007; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,475.50; Amount Paid:$1,475.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2007
  • Due Date:10/18/2007; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TOWN OF LANTANA is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KREUSLER-WALSH , JANE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , ESQ, CLARK WICKHAM