Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 20:04:11 (UTC).

FLORIDA SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ASO J RICHARD KERR V J.H. NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC

Case Summary

On 09/27/2002 FLORIDA SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ASO J RICHARD KERR filed an Other lawsuit against J H NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLORIDA SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ASO J RICHARD KERR

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Counter Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

FLORIDA SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ASO J RICHARD KERR

AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC

J H NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants, Counter Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

J.H. NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC

JH NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC AKA

AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC

OCEAN GRANDE LAND HOLDINGS INC AKA

GARCIA/BRENNER & STROMBERG INC

Respondents, 3Rd Party Defendants, Cross Defendants, Counter Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

GALE INDUSTRIES INC DBA GALE INSULATION

J.H. NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC

FANTASTIC FRAMERS INC

MONTGOMERY , DAVID A

WATERMAN , GEORGE

JH NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC AKA

AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC

OCEAN GRANDE LAND HOLDINGS INC AKA

MASCO CONTRACTORS SERVICES CENTRAL INC

FANTASTIC FARMERS

CORNERSTONE FINISHES INC d/b/a DRYWALL ENTERPRISES

HUSEMAN , RICH

GARCIA/BRENNER & STROMBERG INC

DOE'S WINDOWS

Defendants, Respondents, Petitioners, Counter Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC

J H NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

JH NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC AKA

MASCO CONTRACTORS SERVICES CENTRAL INC

Respondents and 3Rd Party Defendants

GALE INDUSTRIES INC DBA GALE INSULATION

FANTASTIC FRAMERS INC

MONTGOMERY , DAVID A

WATERMAN , GEORGE

MASCO CONTRACTORS SERVICES CENTRAL INC

FANTASTIC FARMERS

CORNERSTONE FINISHES INC d/b/a DRYWALL ENTERPRISES

HUSEMAN , RICH

GARCIA/BRENNER & STROMBERG INC

DOE'S WINDOWS

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

COLEMAN , RODERICK F

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HOWARD , JOHN A

SHOWEN ESQ, ANDREW V

REGAN , JEFFREY C

Defendant, Respondent and Counter Defendant Attorney

SHOWEN ESQ, ANDREW V

Other Attorneys

TUZZIO ESQ, GERARD A

 

Court Documents

REQUEST

03/03/2011:REQUEST

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

02/09/2010:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

NOTICE

01/22/2010:NOTICE

MOTION

09/05/2008:MOTION

RETURNED MAIL

02/22/2008:RETURNED MAIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/07/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

02/01/2008:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

OBJECTION

01/30/2008:OBJECTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

01/28/2008:NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

01/23/2008:MOTION TO WITHDRAW

MOTION

01/09/2008:MOTION

RETURNED MAIL

01/07/2008:RETURNED MAIL

ORDER

12/03/2007:ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/30/2007:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/19/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/19/2007:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

06/27/2007:NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

ORDER

03/02/2007:ORDER

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2012
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:DJ D FRENCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/NOTICE JUDG DISMISSAL; Notes:OCTOBER 18TH, 2012 AT 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO COMPEL; Notes:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY ZURICH AMERICAN INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION; Notes:TO INTERGS AND FIRST REQ FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS Filed By 3RD PARTY DEFENDANT FANTASTIC FRAMERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST; Notes:FIRST FOR PRODUCTION Filed by DEFENDANT AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC. Filed by COUNTER DEFENDANT AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC. Filed by 3RD PARTY PLAINTIFF AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE; Notes:INTERROGATORIES Filed by PLAINTIFF FLORIDA SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ASO J RICHARD KERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Notes:FIRST SET OF INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC. Filed by COUNTER DEFENDANT AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC. Filed by 3RD PARTY PLAINTIFF AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED; Notes:TO RICHARD LARTITEGUI ON 2/3/10

    Read MoreRead Less
453 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2002
  • NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE; Notes:(NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS) OF LAW FIRM OF MITRANI RYNOR ADAMSKY & MACAULAY PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2002
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING/SERVING INTERROGATORIES) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00000 (FIRST SET) OF DEF, GARCIA/BRENNER & STROMBERG INC, TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2002
  • ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:(ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) ; COMPANY NAME IS GARCIA/BRENNER & STROMBERG INC ; ATTORNEY NAME IS CLIFFORD GORMAN TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • PENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 09/27/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS GARCIA/BRENNER & STROMBERG INC COUNTER ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 10/02/02 RET 10/4/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS AIR MOVEMENT SYSTEMS INC COUNTER ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 10/09/02 RET 10/11/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS J.H. NORMAN CONSTRUCTION CO INC COUNTER ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 10/01/02 RET 10/3/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00021209 ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 MITRANI ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y ; NBR OF PAGES = 00043 W/ATTACHMENT/VIOLATION OF FS 553.84

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUILDER SERVICES GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUZZIO GERARD A