Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 01:25:30 (UTC).

DOE, JANE V SOUTH INT PROPERTIES IBC CORP DBA SOUTH INT PROPERTIES

Case Summary

On 08/20/2002 DOE, JANE filed an Other lawsuit against SOUTH INT PROPERTIES IBC CORP DBA SOUTH INT PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DOE , JANE

Defendants and Respondents

DREWNET INC

VOYNETWORKS INC

11206 POCKETBROOK INC

SOUTH INT PROPERTIES IBC CORP DBA SOUTH INT PROPERTIES

ABDO , KHALIL

FUTURESCAPE INC

EBRAHIM , ANDREAS AGHA

SHOEMAKER , IGOR

SMITH , JOHN AKA

FUTURENET INC FKA IGORMANIA INC

GERNER , MICHAEL

INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS CORPORATION

ABDO , JOSEPH E

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Respondent, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FARACH , MANUEL

SCAROLA ESQ, JACK

KING ESQ, WILLIAM BENNETT

PENA , MARK E

STAVROU ESQ, ALEX R

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

08/20/2018:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

INVOICE

02/24/2010:INVOICE

NOTICE OF APPEAL BOOK 023717 PAGE 00501

02/18/2010:NOTICE OF APPEAL BOOK 023717 PAGE 00501

STATEMENT

11/25/2009:STATEMENT

RESPONSE TO:

11/24/2009:RESPONSE TO:

WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT

11/02/2009:WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/29/2009:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/16/2009:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/11/2009:NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED

06/04/2009:AMENDED

NOTICE

06/02/2009:NOTICE

NOTICE OF FILING

06/01/2009:NOTICE OF FILING

EMERGENCY MOTION

04/22/2009:EMERGENCY MOTION

RESPONSE TO:

07/18/2008:RESPONSE TO:

MOTION

02/04/2008:MOTION

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

06/22/2007:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

RESPONSE TO:

03/05/2007:RESPONSE TO:

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/02/2007:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:NON SERVE PETER VOGEL WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER VACATING; Notes:E ARTAU: AND SETTING ASIDE "WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT WRIT ENTERED ON OCT 30 2009 AGAINST PETER VOGEL IS VACATED AND SET ASIDE DTD 08/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:TRANSFERRED CASE TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY (CASE#10CA3655AD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $200.00 on Check Number 25566 to SEARCY DENNEY SCAROLA BARNHART & SHIPLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:ITEMS CHECKED OUT - TRANSFER TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY (ALL EVIDENCE LISTED TRANSFERRED TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ON 3/17/11)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:MARCH 25, 2011 THROUGH APRIL 4, 2011. Filed by ATTORNEY MANUEL FARACH. Filed by ATTORNEY MANUEL FARACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:FEB 3 2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:MAILED TO MANUEL FARACH ESQ.,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:MAILED TO MANUEL FARACH

    Read MoreRead Less
267 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2002
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING/SERVING INTERROGATORIES) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 OF PLTF TO DEFT DREWNET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING/SERVING INTERROGATORIES) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 OF PLTF TO DEFT FUTURENET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING/SERVING INTERROGATORIES) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 OF PLTF TO DEFT INTERNATIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(NOTICE OF FILING/SERVING INTERROGATORIES) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 OF PLTF TO DEFT SOUTH INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00143347 ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 SEARCY DENNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 W/O ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • Receipt Number:CAMB386787; Receipt Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$100.00; total Amount Paid:$100.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • Due Date:02/25/2010; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARACH, MANUEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCAROLA , JACK