Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/21/2019 at 21:02:20 (UTC).

CROWELL, SANDRA A V CRUM, ALEXANDER P

Case Summary

On 03/21/2001 CROWELL, SANDRA A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRUM, ALEXANDER P. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************E-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SORGINI , ROBERT C

WATERBURY , TIMOTHY E

CROWELL , SANDRA A

WATERBURY , STEVEN T

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM FLORIDA FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CAMERON , HENRIETTA

CRUM , ALEXANDER P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner, Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KING ESQ, WILLIAM BENNETT

ROCKENBACH , BARD D

SCAROLA ESQ, JACK

BONE , BILL

BALMUTH ESQ, BARRY S

MCGINLEY , HUBERT S

BALDUCCI , MICHAEL

WILDER ESQ, ROSEMARY B

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S NOTE

07/10/2009:CLERK'S NOTE

CLERK'S NOTE

05/21/2009:CLERK'S NOTE

NOTICE

08/29/2008:NOTICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/07/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

06/19/2008:MOTION

MOTION

05/22/2008:MOTION

RECEIPT OF

04/24/2008:RECEIPT OF

VERDICT BOOK 022601 PAGE 00742

04/24/2008:VERDICT BOOK 022601 PAGE 00742

JURY QUESTIONS

04/23/2008:JURY QUESTIONS

JURY QUESTIONS

04/14/2008:JURY QUESTIONS

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/27/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

EXHIBIT LIST

01/10/2008:EXHIBIT LIST

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

01/09/2008:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

01/09/2008:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

MOTION

01/03/2008:MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/02/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/21/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

10/22/2003:MOTION

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:NOTICE OF EVIDENCE DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:DATED 05-11-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:DATED 05-11-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:DATED 05-11-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTE; Notes:DATED 05-11-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:ATTACHED SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENTS Filed by APPELLANT STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:DENYING STATE FARMS MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL (K STERN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:BY PLTFS TO DFTS MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
668 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; PARTY NAME IS HENRIETTA CAMERON COUNTER ; (SUMMONS SERVED) ; DATE SERVED = 03/27/01 RET 4/2/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; PARTY NAME IS ALEXANDER P CRUM COUNTER ; (SUMMONS RETURNED-NO SERVICE) RET'D 4/25/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2001
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00306114 SEARCY DENNEY ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2001
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y W/O ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2004
  • Receipt Number:CAMB55275; Receipt Amount: $7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • Receipt Number:CAMB54128; Receipt Amount: $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$58.50; total Amount Paid:$58.50; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • Due Date:09/15/2004; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • Due Date:09/15/2004; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$7.50; Amount Paid:$7.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALMUTH , BARRY S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Balducci