Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/31/2019 at 19:17:41 (UTC).

COOPER, ELWOOD J V COUNTY OF PALM BEACH GOVERNMENTAL CENTER COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 11/26/2002 COOPER, ELWOOD J filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF PALM BEACH GOVERNMENTAL CENTER COMPLEX. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROWE , CYMONIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************I-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2002

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROWE , CYMONIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant

COOPER , ELWOOD J

Defendants and Respondents

CITY OF RIVIERA BEACH

COUNTY OF PALM BEACH GOVERNMENTAL CENTER COMPLEX

CITY OF DELRAY BEACH

CITY OF LAKE WORTH

TOWN OF JUPITER

CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH

CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

STATE OF FLORIDA

Respondents and 3Rd Party Defendants

CITY OF LAKE WORTH

TOWN OF JUPITER

CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH

CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

STATE OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BUSBY , LINA

HUNECKE ESQ, JENNIFER H

KILLEBREW ESQ, KELLIE

KOZOL ESQ, CATHERINE M

WARREN , LAWONDA R

Other Attorneys

GODDEAU , CHRISTY L

CHEROF ESQ, JAMES A

BAIRD ESQ, THOMAS JAY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

04/18/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

RECORD

01/05/2011:RECORD

ORDER SETTING HEARING

09/30/2010:ORDER SETTING HEARING

NOTICE TRANSMIT RECORD APPEAL

05/08/2009:NOTICE TRANSMIT RECORD APPEAL

TRUE COPY

04/27/2009:TRUE COPY

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

03/17/2009:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

REQUEST

02/23/2009:REQUEST

CORRESPONDENCE

02/02/2009:CORRESPONDENCE

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

02/02/2009:ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/04/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

11/03/2008:MOTION

LETTER

10/22/2008:LETTER

DEMAND FOR:

08/25/2008:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/02/2008:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/17/2008:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/17/2008:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/17/2008:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/08/2008:NOTICE OF SERVICE

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:MLD TO KELLIE KILLEBREW ESQ.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:ROWE; ON 6/3/2019 @ 8:45AM RM 10C DTD 5/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER C ROWE: DIRECTING COLEMAN MEDIUM FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION TO MAKE PETITIONER AVAILABLE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE DIRECTED TO MAKE PLT AVAILABLE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CMC SET FOR JUNE 3 2019 AT 8:45 AM * SEE ORD FOR DETAILS * DTD 05/15/19; Notes:C ROWE: DIRECTING COLEMAN MEDIUM FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION TO MAKE PETITIONER AVAILABLE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE DIRECTED TO MAKE PLT AVAILABLE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CMC SET FOR JUNE 3 2019 AT 8:45 AM * SEE ORD FOR DETAILS * DTD 05/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AMENDED - FOR LIMITED APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATING EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS FB THOMAS J BAIRD OBO TOWN OF JUPITER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:[LIMITED] AND E-MAIL DESIGNATION F/B L BUSBY OBO DFT CITY OF RIVIERA BEACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:KELLIE KILLEBREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND EMAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION F/B ATTY LAWONDA WARREN OBO DFT CITY OF DELARY BEACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FB ATTY THOMAS BAIRD OBO TOWN OF JUPITER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:C ROWE: ON PET'S MOTION TO REOPEN THE CASE FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER DIRECTING RHE CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH TO SHOW CAUSE AND THE PRINCIPAL AND THIRD PARTY DFTS TO FILE NOTICE OF APPEEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATING TELEPHONICE AND E- MAIL CONTACT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS D.E.#249 FILED ON 3-29-19: BEFORE JUDGE ROWE ON 5-8-19 AT 8:45 AM RM 10C. DTD 4-2-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER C ROWE DTD. 4/2/19 DIRECTING COLEMAN MEDIUM FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION TO MAKE PETITIONER AVAILABLE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING SET FOR 5/8/19 AT OR NEAR 8:45 AM; Notes:C ROWE DTD. 4/2/19 DIRECTING COLEMAN MEDIUM FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION TO MAKE PETITIONER AVAILABLE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING SET FOR 5/8/19 AT OR NEAR 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
256 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2009
  • Receipt Number:CAMB293752; Receipt Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • Receipt Number:CAMB65495; Receipt Amount: $63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$901.00; total Amount Paid:$506.00; total-Amount Balance:$395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Due Date:03/29/2019; Description:108FF Reopen $50 PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Due Date:04/30/2009; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • Due Date:02/25/2009; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$488.00; Amount Paid:$143.00; Amount Balance:$345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • Due Date:01/20/2009; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • Due Date:01/20/2009; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • Due Date:01/14/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$51.00; Amount Paid:$51.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • Due Date:01/14/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$12.00; Amount Paid:$12.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAIRD ESQ, THOMAS JAY