Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/01/2019 at 19:51:51 (UTC).

COLON, JONATHAN RAMIRO V SOUTH FLORIDA BLOOD BANKS INC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2003 COLON, JONATHAN RAMIRO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOUTH FLORIDA BLOOD BANKS INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************I-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

COLON , SAMIRA JOHANNY

COLON , YOLETH S

COLON , JONATHAN RAMIRO

Defendants and Respondents

BLUEBIRD CORPORATION

ROBERT BOSCH CORPORATION

EVANS , MARY

REESE , MARGARET

BLUEBIRD BODY CORPORATION

CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY INC

CUMMINS INC

SMITH , TRACIE A

SMITH , TRACIE L

RINEHART , LINDA

SOUTH FLORIDA BLOOD BANKS INC

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WAXMAN ESQ, LYNN G

GORDON , ROBERT E

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FITZGERALD III, EDWARD COLE

BRADFORD ESQ, DANA G II

BAVOL ESQ, CHARLES D

RICHBURG ESQ, SCOTT D

SCHWARTZ ESQ, ROBERT H

 

Court Documents

NOT OF INTENT TO DISP EVIDENCE

06/05/2014:NOT OF INTENT TO DISP EVIDENCE

MEMORANDUM

06/16/2008:MEMORANDUM

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/16/2008:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/16/2008:NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/22/2008:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/31/2008:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER

01/31/2008:ORDER

MOTION

12/17/2007:MOTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/29/2007:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/29/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

10/09/2007:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ORDER

08/23/2007:ORDER

ORDER

08/23/2007:ORDER

RESPONSE TO:

08/20/2007:RESPONSE TO:

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/07/2007:NOTICE OF HEARING

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

06/25/2007:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST

05/07/2007:REQUEST

STATEMENT

02/28/2007:STATEMENT

326 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISPOSED/RETURNED EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOT OF INTENT TO DISP EVIDENCE; Notes:NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.430 (F)(2) FILED BY PLT JONATHAN RAMIRO COLON Filed by PLAINTIFF JONATHAN RAMIRO COLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023028 PAGE 00106; Notes:D HAFELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION; Notes:JOINT OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:12-08-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION; Notes:TO REQUIRE CLERK TO PROVIDE COPY OF SEALED PLEADINGS FILED 12-01-2008 Filed by PLAINTIFF JONATHAN RAMIRO COLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SEALING; Notes:FILED IN VAULT ROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:UNDER SEAL SECOND REVISED EXHIBIT A (UNDER SEAL- EXHIBIT A) Filed by PLAINTIFF YOLETH S COLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:UNDER SEAL REVISED EXHIBIT "A (CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE) TO PLT'S PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S SETTLEMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF YOLETH S COLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:Associated to docket FDS filed on 2008-11-20

    Read MoreRead Less
1,092 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2003
  • PENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 02/05/03 *** CLERK'S TO DOCKET AND FILE ALL LEGAL MEMORANDA FILED IN THIS CASE, DTD. 2/5/08 **VOL DISM AS TO COUNT VI DTD 4/3/08**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2003
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:(SUMMONS ISSUED) ; COMPANY NAME IS SOUTH FLORIDA BLOOD BANKS INC COUNTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2003
  • RECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00014676 ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001 GRODON & DONER PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2003
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET) ; NBR OF PAGES = 00001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2003
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y ; NBR OF PAGES = 00004 W/O ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • Receipt Number:CAMB77804; Receipt Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • Receipt Number:CAMB49867; Receipt Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$10.00; total Amount Paid:$10.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • Due Date:05/16/2005; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • Due Date:07/21/2004; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$6.00; Amount Paid:$6.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cummins, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Robert Bosch LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAVOL ESQ, CHARLES D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford, Dana G