This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/03/2019 at 14:33:30 (UTC).

CLEMONS, WILLIAM V AC&S INC

Case Summary

On 08/20/1997 CLEMONS, WILLIAM filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AC S INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CLEMONS , EDYTHE

Defendants and Respondents

OWENS CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP

WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP

SEARS

ABEX CORP

KAISER ALUMINUM CORP

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

W R GRACE & CO

PORTER HAYDEN CO

A W CHESTERTON CO

T&N PLC

UNIROYAL

RAPID AMERICAN CORP

GARLOCK INC

PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP

GENERAL REFRACTORIES CO

COMBUSTION ENGINEERING CORP

FIBERBOARD CORP

ASBESTOS CLAIMS MANAGEMENT CORP FKA NATIONAL GYPSUM CO

UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS CORP

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

TOMERSON ESQ, H KEITH

HANRECK , ROBERT J

SWARTWOOD ESQ, GREGORY D

JOHNSON , VIRGINIA EASLEY

Other Attorneys

GREENE ESQ, MARK

REYNOLDS II ESQ, CHARLES E

FITZGERALD ESQ, J MICHAEL

SENDLER ESQ, ROBERT B

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/26/2012:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

05/24/2007:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER

03/28/2006:ORDER

MOTION

03/24/2006:MOTION

ORDER

04/06/2005:ORDER

REPORT

04/06/2005:REPORT

NOTICE

01/06/2005:NOTICE

NOTICE

01/06/2005:NOTICE

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/11/2002:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER

09/17/2001:ORDER

ORDER

08/01/2001:ORDER

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/16/2001:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE

04/16/2001:NOTICE

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/30/2001:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/21/1999:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE

10/07/1999:NOTICE

WITNESS LIST

10/06/1999:WITNESS LIST

MOTION TO DISMISS

09/03/1999:MOTION TO DISMISS

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE Filed by PLAINTIFF WILLIAM CLEMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:AS TO CROWN CORK ONLY Filed by PLAINTIFF WILLIAM CLEMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2006
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Notes:FILED SEPT 16 2002 - CASE NO. 02-12687(JFK) Filed by DEFENDANT AC&S INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2006
  • DocketREDISPOSED; Notes:Associated to docket ORD filed on 2006-03-28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Notes:SUB EVERT & WEATHERSBY LLC AS COUNSL FOR BECHTEL CORPORATION - FIR FOWLER WHITE BURNETT PA RELEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • DocketREOPEN; Notes:Associated to docket MOT filed on 2006-03-24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Notes:FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL **UP 3/24/06 W/UNSIGNED ORDER** Filed by DEFENDANT BECHTEL CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:MOTION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL W/ATTACHMENT Filed by DEFENDANT BECHTEL CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes:Associated to docket ORD filed on 2005-04-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Notes:CLOSING CASE PURSUANT TO INDIVIDUAL CASE REPORT; CAUSE MAY BE REOPENED BY ORDER OF THE COURT UPON MOTION OF ANY PARTY FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:(NOTICE OF HEARING) ; HEARING DATE/TIME = 02/19/98 / 08:45 ABOVE MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:(MOTION TO DISMISS) OF DFT W R GRACE TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF ADOPTION OF DFT US MINERAL OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER, MOTION TO DISMISS,STRIKE AND MEMORANDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF DEFT. A.W. CHESTERTON CO. OF ADOPTION OF MASTER STAN- DARD ANSWER, AFFIRM. DEF. & MOTIONS TO DISMISS & STRIKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Notes:(NOTICE) OF NON-PARTY C T CORPORATION OF IMPROPER SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:(CIVIL COVER SHEET)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/1997
  • DocketPENDING; Notes:CASE STATUS = PE DATE FILED = 08/20/97

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALL ACTION ABATED; Notes:(ALL ACTION ABATED PURSUANT TO RCP 1.100 (C))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF; Notes:(RECEIPT FOR FILING FEE - NEW CASES) ; CHECK RECEIPT NUMBER = 00238317 J MICHAEL FITZGERALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:(COMPLAINT) ; JR.-NOJR/CT-NOCT = Y W/O ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less