Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/17/2021 at 01:06:37 (UTC).

ZERO 6 INCORPORATED (ASSIGNEE OF SCHLAG, NANCY) V GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 ZERO 6 INCORPORATED ASSIGNEE OF SCHLAG, NANCY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ZERO 6 INCORPORATED (ASSIGNEE OF SCHLAG, NANCY)

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

TROWELL , LINDSEY R

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/11/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/10/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER CANCELLING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE & DIRECTING PLT TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFT -JUDGE BRYSON 1/11/2021

01/11/2021:ORDER CANCELLING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE & DIRECTING PLT TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFT -JUDGE BRYSON 1/11/2021

COMPLAINT

12/23/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3853382

12/23/2020:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3853382

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

12/23/2020:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/23/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/23/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/23/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE F/B ATTY OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED 1/29/21 SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:SB; Room:#7 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 1/20/2021 10:00:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELLING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE & DIRECTING PLT TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFT -JUDGE BRYSON 1/11/2021; Notes:CANCELLING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE & DIRECTING PLT TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFT -JUDGE BRYSON 1/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3853382; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/23/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/23/2020; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 1/20/2021 10:00 AM BRYSON, JUDGEMARNI; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 1/20/2021 10:00 AM BRYSON, JUDGEMARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3853382; Notes:$310.00 3853382 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZERO 6 INCORPORATED (ASSIGNEE OF SCHLAG, NANCY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trowell, Lindsey R