This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/11/2021 at 20:15:41 (UTC).

ZERO 6 INCORPORATED ASSIGNEE OF MOON WALTER V SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 ZERO 6 INCORPORATED ASSIGNEE OF MOON WALTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ZERO 6 INCORPORATED ASSIGNEE OF MOON WALTER

Defendant and Respondent

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GUTIERREZ , JOVANNI F.

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/13/2021:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

01/07/2021:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER

01/07/2021:ANSWER

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

09/25/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/18/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/18/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

08/13/2020:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/13/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ORDER CANCELLING PRETRIAL ON 8/19/20 & DIRECTING PLT TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFT -JUDGE BRYSON 8/12/2020

08/12/2020:ORDER CANCELLING PRETRIAL ON 8/19/20 & DIRECTING PLT TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFT -JUDGE BRYSON 8/12/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3659135

06/23/2020:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3659135

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

06/22/2020:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/22/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/22/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

COMPLAINT

06/22/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/22/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:TO COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:SB; Room:#7 (South Branch); Notes:ORD-CANCEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ZERO 6 INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B J GUTIERREZ OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B J GUTIERREZ OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 8/19/2020 10:00:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:06/23/2020; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM TO DFT. E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 8/19/2020 10:00 AM BRYSON, JUDGEMARNI; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 8/19/2020 10:00 AM BRYSON, JUDGEMARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3659135; Notes:$185.00 3659135 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:FB PLTS ATTY CHRIS KASPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST. FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT. FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZERO 6 INCORPORATED (ASSIGNEE OF SCHLAG, NANCY) is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTIERREZ , JOVANNI F.