This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/12/2021 at 21:38:41 (UTC).

ZARETSKY, SCOTT V SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY LLC

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 ZARETSKY, SCOTT filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KERNER , SCOTT and MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KERNER , SCOTT

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ZARETSKY , SCOTT

WALFISH , GWEN

Respondents and Defendants

SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY LLC

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WEBER , BRANDEN

JACOBSON , JOSHUA R

NAUMAN , STEVEN

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING HEARING

02/11/2021:ORDER SETTING HEARING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/27/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/27/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/26/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/11/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/11/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO STRIKE

01/11/2021:MOTION TO STRIKE

COMPLAINT

12/30/2020:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/12/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/19/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/19/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/13/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 3769839

10/06/2020:PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 3769839

COMPLAINT

10/05/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/05/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED DEFENDANTS NAME ON SUMMONS MUST MATCH NAME IN COMPLAINT BODY EXACTLY

10/05/2020:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED DEFENDANTS NAME ON SUMMONS MUST MATCH NAME IN COMPLAINT BODY EXACTLY

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/05/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/05/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:MARX DTD 02/11/2021: 03/29/2021 @ 1:30 PM, CTRM 11B, MATTER: MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT, SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:DEFENDANT, SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS CO-COUNSEL FOR SCOTT ZARETSKY FILED BY ATTY JACOBSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B DFT SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY LLC DBA SCHUMACHER SUBARU OF DELRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLTS AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B DFT SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes:DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPHS 2 - 15 AND 18 OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FIRST AMENDED FILED BY PLTS ***ADDING GWEN WALFISH AS A PLAINTIFF***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS CO-COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FILED BY ATTY NAUMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DFT SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/06/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/06/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:bweber@forthepeople.com;mhoilett@forthepeople.com AS TO DFT SCHUMACHER AUTOMOTIVE DELRAY LLC DBA SCHUMACHER SUBARU OF DELRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 3769839; Notes:$431.00 3769839 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:bweber@forthepeople.com;mhoilett@forthepeople.com AS TO SUBARU OF AMERICA INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED DEFENDANTS NAME ON SUMMONS MUST MATCH NAME IN COMPLAINT BODY EXACTLY; Notes:bweber@forthepeople.com;mhoilett@forthepeople.com DEFENDANTS NAME ON SUMMONS MUST MATCH NAME IN COMPLAINT BODY EXACTLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:bweber@forthepeople.com;mhoilett@forthepeople.com AS TO SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schumacher Automotive Delray, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDEN WEBER, ESQ