This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/13/2018 at 17:32:50 (UTC).

YUKENAVITCH, TESSIE

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 YUKENAVITCH, TESSIE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , JANIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , JANIS

 

Party Details

Petitioners

STUDER , ANTONIA C

YUKENAVITCH , ALEXANDRA C

Decedent

YUKENAVITCH , TESSIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AVAKIAN , BRAD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • ORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 30259 PAGE 700-701; Notes:SIGNED JUDGE J B KEYSER 11-15-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:SIGNED JUDGE J B KEYSER 11-15-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: AVAKIAN, BRAD; Notes:REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: AVAKIAN, BRAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • PETITIONER: STUDER, ANTONIA C; Notes:Petitioner: STUDER, ANTONIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • WILL BOOK 30259 PAGE 245-249; Notes:ORIGINAL DTD 06-22-94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • CODICIL; Notes:ORIGINAL DTD 04-02-98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • PAID $4.00 ON RECEIPT 2918427; Notes:$4.00 2918427 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • PAID $346.00 ON RECEIPT 2914812; Notes:$346.00 2914812 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • WILL; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • PAID FUNERAL BILL; Notes:F/B ANTONIA STUDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY AVAKIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes:F/B ATTY AVAKIAN OBO ANTONIA C STUDER AND ALEXANDRA C YUKENAVITCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Receipt Number:2918427; Receipt Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Receipt Number:2914812; Receipt Amount: $346.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$350.00; total Amount Paid:$350.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Due Date:11/13/2018; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Due Date:11/09/2018; Description:502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due:$346.00; Amount Paid:$346.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less