This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 10/12/2022 at 09:54:58 (UTC).

YORK, KIMBERLY JEAN V CITY OF BOCA RATON

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 YORK, KIMBERLY JEAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF BOCA RATON. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YORK , KIMBERLY JEAN

Defendant and Respondent

CITY OF BOCA RATON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AGUIRRE , JOSE E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/31/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/31/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4599391

09/02/2022:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4599391

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/06/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/06/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/06/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4603876

09/07/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4603876

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4603876; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/07/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4603876; Notes: $10.00 4603876 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT. F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: TO DFT. F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@lowercaselaw.com;jose@lowercaselaw.com AS TO DFT CITY OF BOCA RATON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4599391; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/02/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4599391; Notes: $401.00 4599391 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aguirre, Jose E.