This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 22:48:56 (UTC).

WOLFE, SANDRA V VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 WOLFE, SANDRA filed an Other lawsuit against VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WOLFE , SANDRA

Defendants and Respondents

CELLCO PARTNERSHIP

NESTOR DOE

VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ZAPPITELL ESQ, DAVID J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/18/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/18/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/18/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/18/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/18/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/18/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4432623

04/20/2022:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4432623

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

05/02/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4459364

05/10/2022:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4459364

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/23/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/23/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC - 05/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED CELLCO PARTNERSHIP - 05/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4459364; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/10/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/10/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4459364; Notes: $20.00 4459364 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: david@florida.law;cheryl@florida.law AS TO DFT VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: david@florida.law;cheryl@florida.law AS TO DFT CELLCO PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4432623; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/20/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4432623; Notes: $401.00 4432623 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DEFENDANT VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DEFENDANT CELLCO PARTNERSHIP F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: TO DEFENDANT VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICE LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: TO DEFENDANT CELLCO PARTNERSHIP F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID ZAPPITELL