This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/05/2019 at 17:34:11 (UTC).

WOLFE, ANITA

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 WOLFE, ANITA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KROLL , KATHLEEN J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KROLL , KATHLEEN J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEINBERG , MARVIN L

Decedent

WOLFE , ANITA

Not Classified By Court

WEINBERG , MARVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

KULUNAS , JOSEPH JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS; Notes:DOP MARCH 7, 2019 F/B MARVIN L WEINBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Notes:RETURNED CHECK LETTER MAILED 2/12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Notes:RETURNED CHECK LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • RECEIPT 3024329 HAS PAYMENT VOIDED WITH NSF; Notes:3024329

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • VOIDED RECEIPT 3024329; Notes:3024329

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL OUT OF STATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 30404 PAGE 1046-1046; Notes:MARVIN L. WEINBERG HAS BEEN APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SIGNED JUDGE KJ KROLL 02-05-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:SIGND JUDGE KJ KROLL 02-05-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • WILL BOOK 30404 PAGE 1047-1055; Notes:ORIGINAL DTD 11-29-92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PAID $9.00 ON RECEIPT 3024329; Notes:$9.00 3024329 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B MARVIN L WEINBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B ATTY KULUNAS OBO MARVIN L WEINBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • WILL; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Receipt Number:3024329; Receipt Amount: $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Receipt Number:3018714; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$435.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$34.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Due Date:02/12/2019; Description:NSF Fee PB; Amount Due:$25.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Due Date:02/05/2019; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$9.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Due Date:01/31/2019; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less