This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 13:32:26 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB V PARENT, MATTHEW B

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PARENT, MATTHEW B. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

Respondents and Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW B PARENT AKA MATTHEW PARENT

RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

PARENT , MATTHEW B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MELANSON , KYLE

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SUGARMAN , DEBORAH S

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

12/10/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

12/10/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3749041

09/18/2020:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3749041

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/16/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/16/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/08/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/31/2020:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

07/31/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

07/31/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/31/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/20/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

04/13/2020:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

03/31/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

03/31/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

03/31/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

03/31/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

03/31/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

03/31/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3749041; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$1,967.60; total Amount Paid:$1,967.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:09/18/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:09/18/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3749041; Notes:$20.00 3749041 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efile@rasflaw.com;mail@rasflaw.com AS TO DFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW B PARENT AKA MATTHEW PARENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efile@rasflaw.com;mail@rasflaw.com AS TO DFT MATTHEW B PARENT AKA MATTHEW PARENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 09/16/2020 08:30:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $1,947.60 ON RECEIPT 3561262; Notes:$1,947.60 3561262 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:EFILE@RASFLAW.COM;MAIL@RASFLAW.COM AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW B. PARENT A/K/A MATTHEW PARENT EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:EFILE@RASFLAW.COM;MAIL@RASFLAW.COM AS TO RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCAITION INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:EFILE@RASFLAW.COM;MAIL@RASFLAW.COM AS TO MATTHEW B. PARENT A/K/A MATTHEW PARENT EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:VERIFIED FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes:NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31265 PAGE 1582-1583; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM COMPLAINT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELANSON , KYLE