This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 00:48:36 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB DBA CHRISTIANA TRUST NOT INDIVIDUALLY BUR AS TRUSTEE FOR CARLSBAD FUNDING MORTGAGE TRUST V BRAGA, JOSEPHINE

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB DBA CHRISTIANA TRUST NOT INDIVIDUALLY BUR AS TRUSTEE FOR CARLSBAD FUNDING MORTGAGE TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BRAGA, JOSEPHINE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL , LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMALL , LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB DBA CHRISTIANA TRUST NOT INDIVIDUALLY BUR AS TRUSTEE FOR CARLSBAD FUNDING MORTGAGE TRUST

Defendants and Respondents

ROBIN ROSHKIND PA

BRAGA , JOSEPHINE

TENANT III UNKNOWN TENANT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EDGAR BRAGA AKA EDGAR C BRAGA

VILLAGE OF WELLINGTON FLORIDA

TENANT IV UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT II UNKNOWN TENANT

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

TENANT I UNKNOWN TENANT

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPHINE BRAGA AKA JOSEPHINE T BRAGA

BRAGA , EDGAR

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NOYES , LAURA E

WHITING-BOZICH , ALICIA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CASSEL , ALYX

COHEN , LAURIE STILWELL

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

08/08/2019:RETURNED MAIL

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/08/2019:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

07/31/2019:ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

CLERK'S DEFAULT

03/28/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

ORDER DENYING SMALL: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. JOSEPHINE BRAGA AND EDGAR BRAGA SHALL SERVE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER DTD 3-20-19

03/20/2019:ORDER DENYING SMALL: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. JOSEPHINE BRAGA AND EDGAR BRAGA SHALL SERVE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER DTD 3-20-19

ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAW

03/20/2019:ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

12/11/2018:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/30/2018:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

11/30/2018:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/30/2018:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/30/2018:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

11/30/2018:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/16/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/16/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/16/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/16/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS BOOK 30258 PAGE 1533-1534

11/16/2018:LIS PENDENS BOOK 30258 PAGE 1533-1534

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2018:CIVIL COVER SHEET

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ROBIN ROSHKIND PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL; Notes:SMALL DTD 7/31/2019 ON THE TRIAL DOCKET JANUARY 6, 2020 ABD HABYART 31, 2020 E-CLANEDAR CALL IS SET FOR DECEMBER 20, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL; Notes:FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO DFT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes:DFT'S F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING MORTGAGE LOAN OWNERSHIP INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:DEFENDANT, EDGAR BRAGA'S, REQUEST FOR ADMISSION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S STANDING

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due:$5.00; Amount Paid:$5.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$17.50; Amount Paid:$17.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:800F2 CircCivil Real Prop $50,001 < $250,000 PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less