This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/08/2021 at 20:43:17 (UTC).

WILDE, MAURICE V PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 WILDE, MAURICE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WILDE , MAURICE

Respondent and Defendant

PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

HEMPFLING , JONATHAN P

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/15/2020:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SATISFACTION

12/14/2020:SATISFACTION

MOTION TO STRIKE

12/04/2020:MOTION TO STRIKE

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

11/18/2020:MEMORANDUM OF LAW

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/18/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/05/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/05/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

11/03/2020:MOTION TO DISMISS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

10/22/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/22/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDA PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT; Notes:DAS - PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:OF COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION; Notes:OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes:DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR EXTEND TIME TO ACCEPT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT F/B PLT MAURICE WILDE PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW; Notes:IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 12/07/2020 03:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT FILED BY ATTY HEMPFLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 12/07/2020 03:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (F/B DFT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$0.00; total Amount Paid:$0.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/23/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:mauricewilde@outlook.com;wprivateclient@outlook.com AS TO DFT PREMIER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAPPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY; Notes:DUPLICATE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAPPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY; Notes:APPROVED F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Premier Financial Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hempfling, Jonathan P