This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/14/2023 at 10:34:53 (UTC).

WIGHTMAN CONSTRUCTION INC V PEGASO FARM SOUTH LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 WIGHTMAN CONSTRUCTION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEGASO FARM SOUTH LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

WIGHTMAN CONSTRUCTION INC

AQUA ESCAPES, INC.

ATLANTIC SMART INTEGRATION, LLC

CARRUTHERS , ANNIE

E.S. WINDOWS, LLC

GRAU LANDSCAPING & DESIGN, INC.

IN-SITE DESIGN GROUP, LLC

INVISION BUILDERS, LLC

NEW HORIZON PLUMBING, LLC

O'NEAL JR. ROOFING INC

THE WINDOW GUYS OF FLORIDA, INC.

VERTEX AIR CONDITIONING LLC

Defendants, Counter Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

PEGASO FARM SOUTH LLC

WIGHTMAN CONSTRUCTION INC

AQUA ESCAPES, INC.

ATLANTIC SMART INTEGRATION, LLC

CARRUTHERS , ANNIE

E.S. WINDOWS, LLC

GRAU LANDSCAPING & DESIGN, INC.

IN-SITE DESIGN GROUP, LLC

INVISION BUILDERS, LLC

NEW HORIZON PLUMBING, LLC

O'NEAL JR. ROOFING INC

THE WINDOW GUYS OF FLORIDA, INC.

VERTEX AIR CONDITIONING LLC

AQUA ESCAPES INC

ATLANTIC SMART INTEGRATION LLC

E. S. WINDOWS, LLC

GRAU LANDSCAPING & DESIGN INC

IN-SITE DESIGN GROUP LLC

INVISION BUILDERS LLC

NEW HORIZON PLUMBING LLC

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff, Petitioner and Respondent

PEGASO FARM SOUTH LLC

Counter Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

CARRUTHERS , ANNIE

VERTEX AIR CONDITIONING LLC

AQUA ESCAPES INC

ATLANTIC SMART INTEGRATION LLC

E. S. WINDOWS, LLC

GRAU LANDSCAPING & DESIGN INC

IN-SITE DESIGN GROUP LLC

INVISION BUILDERS LLC

NEW HORIZON PLUMBING LLC

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Respondent, Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ADELSTEIN , DAVID M

CHAVEZ ESQ, RUBEN V

KOPELOWITZ , BRIAN R

SUAREZ , MICHAEL F

YOUNG , MARK W

WONDER , CHANTEL C

HOKE , CHRISTINE M

ANDERSON , DENISE M

DELGADO , CEASAR X

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff, Petitioner, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MASON , W

ADELSTEIN , DAVID M

CHAVEZ ESQ, RUBEN V

KOPELOWITZ , BRIAN R

SUAREZ , MICHAEL F

YOUNG , MARK W

WONDER , CHANTEL C

HOKE , CHRISTINE M

ANDERSON , DENISE M

DELGADO , CEASAR X

KRAVITZ , IAN T

VALENTE JR JR, PHILIP L

ELLIS , TAYLOR E

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff, Petitioner and Respondent Attorney

MASON , W

Respondent, Counter Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WONDER , CHANTEL C

HOKE , CHRISTINE M

ANDERSON , DENISE M

DELGADO , CEASAR X

KRAVITZ , IAN T

VALENTE JR JR, PHILIP L

ELLIS , TAYLOR E

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/06/2023:MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S AUGUST 12, 2022 UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL, MEDIATION, AND PRE-TRIAL INSTRUCTIONS

01/04/2023:MOTION MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S AUGUST 12, 2022 UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL, MEDIATION, AND PRE-TRIAL INSTRUCTIONS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/04/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/04/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/04/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/04/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/04/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/04/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/03/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

04/01/2022:LIS PENDENS

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4409840

04/01/2022:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4409840

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

03/30/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE PAY SUMMONS FEE FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/30/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE PAY SUMMONS FEE FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/30/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/30/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT

03/30/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/30/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes: CROSSCLAIM OF WIGHTMAN CONSTRUCTION INC F/B DFT ES WINDOWS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S AUGUST 12, 2022 UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL, MEDIATION, AND PRE-TRIAL INSTRUCTIONS; Notes: MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S AUGUST 12, 2022 UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL, MEDIATION, AND PRE-TRIAL INSTRUCTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF PEGASO FARM SOUTH, LLC'S MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AQUA ESCAPES, INC. DATED CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF PEGASO FARM SOUTH, LLC'S MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT O'NEAL JR. ROOFING, INC CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF PEGASO FARM SOUTH, LLC'S MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT NEW HORIZON PLUMBING, LLC CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED O'NEAL JR ROOFING INC - 10/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE NEW HORIZON PLUMBING LIE - 10/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE AQUA ESCAPES INC - 10/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: (FIRST) TO CTR-PLT PEGASO FARM SOUTH LLC F/B CTR-DFT INVISION BUILDERS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: (FIRST) TO CROSS-CLAIM PLT WIGHTMAN CONSTRUCTION INC F/B CROSSCLAIM DFT INVISION BUILDERS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: dma@kirwinnorris.com;azt@kirwinnorris.com;pleadings@kirwinnorris.com AS TO PEGASO FARM SOUTH LLC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Notes: **NOT RECORDED PURSUANT TO NON-COMPLIANCE W/ RJA 2.520** F/B PLT CC ATTY ADELSTEIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4409840; Notes: $401.00 4409840 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE PAY SUMMONS FEE FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Notes: dma@kirwinnorris.com;azt@kirwinnorris.com;pleadings@kirwinnorris.com PLEASE PAY SUMMONS FEE FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less