This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 17:38:47 (UTC).

WHYNES, MILTON

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 WHYNES, MILTON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIS , SARAH and JOHNSON , LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WILLIS , SARAH

JOHNSON , LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WHYNES , BEVERLY

WHYNES , ROBERT

Decedent

WHYNES , MILTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAMBRA , GEORGIANA F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSTATUS ORDER; Notes:SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHNSON ON JAN 28, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:ORIGINAL DTD 7/1/2014 F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3875628; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3875628; Notes:$401.00 3875628 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:COPY F/B PETRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:COPY F/B PETRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY DAMBRA OBO PETRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER; Notes:WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND F/B AUDREY WHYNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER; Notes:WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND F/B HOLINESS TEMPLE CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER; Notes:WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND F/B CHARMAINE WHYNES-BRADY FKA CHAMAINE WHYNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER; Notes:WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND F/B FIONA WHYNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER; Notes:WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND F/B SAMANTHA WHYNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER; Notes:WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND F/B MILTON WHYNES JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B ROBERT WHYNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B BEVERLY WHYNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B PETRS, MILTON WHYNES AKA MILTON N WHYNES AKA MILTON NATHAN WHYNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:ID: Probate Central, MH, Guardianship - ID (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Georgiana Dambra