This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/23/2021 at 01:28:52 (UTC).

WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC. V MERNICK, KENNETH R

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MERNICK, KENNETH R. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.

Respondents and Defendants

MERNICK , LINDA S

MERNICK , KENNETH R

UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

WILDER , LEONARD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

11/10/2020:LIS PENDENS

PAID $305.60 ON RECEIPT 3808703

11/13/2020:PAID $305.60 ON RECEIPT 3808703

COMPLAINT

11/10/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/13/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/13/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3813130

11/17/2020:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3813130

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/24/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/24/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/05/2021:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/05/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

02/09/2021:CLERK'S DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:WILDER-LITIGATION@ASSOC-LAW.COM;SMURGUIA@ASSOC-LAW.COM;YDELGADO@ASSOC-LAW.COM KENNETH R MERNICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION FOR DEFAULT KENNETH R. MERNICK AND LINDA S. MERNICK, KENNETH R. MERNICK AND LINDA S. MERNICK, CLERK CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS KENNETH R. MERNICK LINDA S. MERNICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED KENNETH R MERNICK - 11/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE LINDA S MERNICK - 11/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3813130; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$325.60; total Amount Paid:$325.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/17/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/17/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3813130; Notes:$20.00 3813130 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3808703; Receipt Amount: $305.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/13/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/13/2020; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:wilder-litigation@assoc-law.com;smurguia@assoc-law.com;ydelgado@assoc-law.com AS TO DFT LINDA S MERNICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:WILDER-LITIGATION@ASSOC-LAW.COM;SMURGUIA@ASSOC-LAW.COM;YDELGADO@ASSOC-LAW.COM AS TO DFT KENNETH R MERNICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $305.60 ON RECEIPT 3808703; Notes:$305.60 3808703 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR FORECLOSURE- E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31921 PAGE 301-301; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard Wilder