This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/21/2021 at 02:19:27 (UTC).

WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC V ISIS ZALAZAR, JORGE ALBERTO

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against ISIS ZALAZAR, JORGE ALBERTO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

ISIS ZALAZAR , JORGE ALBERTO

VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JORGE ALBERTO ISIS ZALAZAR

VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

JACKSON , IRMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

WILDER , LEONARD

 

Court Documents

PAID $10.60 ON RECEIPT 3862541

01/05/2021:PAID $10.60 ON RECEIPT 3862541

VOL DISMISS W DISCHARGE BOOK 32075 PAGE 1878-1878

12/31/2020:VOL DISMISS W DISCHARGE BOOK 32075 PAGE 1878-1878

ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE

12/09/2020:ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

09/10/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

09/03/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY DEFENDANT -JUDGE GARRISON 8/28/2020

08/31/2020:ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY DEFENDANT -JUDGE GARRISON 8/28/2020

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/31/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

MOTION EX PARTE/ FOR SUBSTITUTING PARTY DEFENDANT. F/B PLT

08/25/2020:MOTION EX PARTE/ FOR SUBSTITUTING PARTY DEFENDANT. F/B PLT

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

08/21/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/21/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3711371

08/12/2020:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3711371

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/07/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $339.60 ON RECEIPT 3696094

07/28/2020:PAID $339.60 ON RECEIPT 3696094

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3862541; Receipt Amount: $10.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$370.20; total Amount Paid:$370.20; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/05/2021; Description:VDAL Voluntary Dismissal Legal Description; Amount Due:$0.60; Amount Paid:$0.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/05/2021; Description:VD1P Volun Diss 1st Page $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.60 ON RECEIPT 3862541; Notes:$10.60 3862541 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOL DISMISS W DISCHARGE BOOK 32075 PAGE 1878-1878; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING SERVICE; Notes:JUDGE GARRISON ON 12/9/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE JORGE ALBERTO ISIS ZALAZAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:RETURN OF NON-SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JORGE ALBERTO ISIS ZALAZAR

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/28/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/28/2020; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $339.60 ON RECEIPT 3696094; Notes:$339.60 3696094 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:wilder-litigation@assoc-law.com;smurguia@assoc-law.com;ydelgado@assoc-law.com AS TO VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:wilder-litigation@assoc-law.com;smurguia@assoc-law.com;ydelgado@assoc-law.com AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JORGE ALBERTO ISIS ZALAZAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:wilder-litigation@assoc-law.com;smurguia@assoc-law.com;ydelgado@assoc-law.com AS TO JORGE ALBERTO ISIS ZALAZAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31619 PAGE 96-97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOC is a litigant

Latest cases where WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard Wilder