This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/16/2022 at 02:25:47 (UTC).

WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC V BULEN, GORDON L

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BULEN, GORDON L. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GORDON L BULEN

VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

BULEN , GORDON L

SUNTRUST BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WILDER , LEONARD

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $22.10 ON RECEIPT 4335355

02/03/2022:PAID $22.10 ON RECEIPT 4335355

PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 4332286

02/01/2022:PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 4332286

LIS PENDENS BOOK 33283 PAGE 1899-1900

01/31/2022:LIS PENDENS BOOK 33283 PAGE 1899-1900

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

AGREED ORDER FEUER: ON THIRD PARTY PURCHASER'S OBJECTION TO DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS. RESERVED; AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OF REFORECLOSURE TO FORECLOSE OMITTED DEFENDANT. GRANTED - DEEMED FILED DTD 1-25-22

01/25/2022:AGREED ORDER FEUER: ON THIRD PARTY PURCHASER'S OBJECTION TO DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS. RESERVED; AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OF REFORECLOSURE TO FORECLOSE OMITTED DEFENDANT. GRANTED - DEEMED FILED DTD 1-25-22

PAID $28.00 ON RECEIPT 4316473

01/19/2022:PAID $28.00 ON RECEIPT 4316473

MOTION THIRD PARTY PURCHASERS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OF REFORECLOSURE TO FORECLOSE OMITTED DEFENDANT

01/13/2022:MOTION THIRD PARTY PURCHASERS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OF REFORECLOSURE TO FORECLOSE OMITTED DEFENDANT

OBJECTION

01/13/2022:OBJECTION

CLAIM FILED

01/07/2022:CLAIM FILED

FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - 11-3-2021

01/06/2022:FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - 11-3-2021

DISBURSEMENT REQUEST

12/29/2021:DISBURSEMENT REQUEST

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 33166 PAGE 1601-1602

12/23/2021:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 33166 PAGE 1601-1602

PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 4287555

12/20/2021:PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 4287555

FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE - 11-3-2021

11/18/2021:FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE - 11-3-2021

ORDER SSCHOSGFEUER DTD 11/3/21 ADMITTING NOTICE OF SALE AS IS AND ALLOWING ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF SALE -GRANTED

11/03/2021:ORDER SSCHOSGFEUER DTD 11/3/21 ADMITTING NOTICE OF SALE AS IS AND ALLOWING ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF SALE -GRANTED

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

11/03/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

PAID $98,276.70 ON RECEIPT 4235566

11/03/2021:PAID $98,276.70 ON RECEIPT 4235566

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUNTRUST BANK - 2/4/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4335355; Receipt Amount: $22.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$120,222.54; total Amount Paid:$120,222.54; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:02/03/2022; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:02/03/2022; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:02/03/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:02/03/2022; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$2.50; Amount Paid:$2.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $22.10 ON RECEIPT 4335355; Notes:$22.10 4335355 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4332286; Receipt Amount: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 4332286; Notes:$50.00 4332286 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/17/2021; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/17/2021; Description:800F1 CircCivil Real Prop $50,000 or < PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $440.60 ON RECEIPT 3911526; Notes:$440.60 3911526 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AH: Circuit Civil Central - AH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:wilder-litigation@assoc-law.com;smurguia@assoc-law.com;ydelgado@assoc-law.com AS TO VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:wilder-litigation@assoc-law.com;smurguia@assoc-law.com;ydelgado@assoc-law.com AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GORDON L BULEN EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:wilder-litigation@assoc-law.com;smurguia@assoc-law.com;ydelgado@assoc-law.com AS TO GORDON L BULEN EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32205 PAGE 693-694; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOC is a litigant

Latest cases where WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard Wilder