This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/22/2023 at 15:04:01 (UTC).

WHITE, JAMES M V COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 WHITE, JAMES M filed an Other lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DELGADO , LUIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DELGADO , LUIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WHITE , JAMES M

Defendants and Respondents

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

GAS ATTENDANT ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DENNEY , BRIAN R

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BEDARD , BENJAMIN L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/22/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4689283

11/23/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4689283

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/01/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/05/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

12/05/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

12/05/2022:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/06/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/06/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/20/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVING PREMISES LIABILITY INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes: F/B ATTY BENJAMIN L BEDARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY BENJAMIN L BEDARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B ATTY BENJAMIN L BEDARD OBO DFT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OFSERVICF SERVED COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION - 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4689283; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/23/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/23/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4689283; Notes: $411.00 4689283 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: _bdenneyteam@searcylaw.com AS TO COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION E FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Denney, Brian Robert